Jermaine McAdory v. Alexis Limon, et al
Plaintiff: JERMAINE MCADORY
Defendant: ALEXIS LIMON, RANDALL WILBORN and ALFONSO GREER
Case Number: 24-1703
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 7 Filed Response by Appellees Alexis Limon, Randall Wilborn and Alfonso Greer to Appellant's Jurisdictional Memorandum. [7][7387330] [24-1703] (Mills, Sara) [Entered: 06/11/2024 11:49 AM]
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Letter regarding timeliness. IT IS ORDERED that appellees shall file, on or before June 11, 2024, a response to appellants jurisdictional memorandum, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of April 29, 2024. JXK [6] [7384752] [24-1703] (AP) [Entered: 05/28/2024 10:15 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 5 Filed letter from Appellant Jermaine McAdory in response to the court's order regarding timeliness of appeal. (Forwarded from the District Court) [5][7384315] [24-1703] (PS) [Entered: 05/23/2024 03:55 PM]
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders appellant to show cause for his failure to respond to the court's order of 04/29/2024. Appellant shall file his response on or before 06/04/2024. Appellant is advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The clerk of this court shall attach a copy of the 04/29/2024 order to appellant's copy of this order. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7022 0410 0003 3396 4554. JXK [4] [7383764] [24-1703] (MAN) [Entered: 05/21/2024 03:16 PM]
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING as unnecessary Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal without prepayment of the filing fee, signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 4/29/2024. Plaintiff is no longer incarcerated, so the Prison Litigation Reform Act does not apply to his appeal. Because Plaintiff was allowed to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, he may proceed in forma pauperis on appeal without further authorization. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). Date IFP granted: 04/29/2024. [3] [7379098] [24-1703] (CG) [Entered: 04/29/2024 11:26 AM]
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant shall file, on or before May 13, 2024, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. If appellant wishes to request an extension of time in which to file the notice of appeal, appellant should file an appropriate motion in the district court, not this court, as soon as possible. Appellants jurisdictional memorandum should include a discussion of the status of any such motion. (See order for further details). [7379066] JXK [2] [7379066] [24-1703] (HTP) [Entered: 04/29/2024 10:30 AM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/10/2024. [1] [7378842] [24-1703] (MAN) [Entered: 04/26/2024 11:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jermaine McAdory v. Alexis Limon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMAINE MCADORY
Represented By: Jermaine McAdory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXIS LIMON
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Sara Catherine Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL WILBORN
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Sara Catherine Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFONSO GREER
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Sara Catherine Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?