Rose Meacham v. University of Illinois, et al
Plaintiff: ROSE MEACHAM
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS, UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM, GOOGLE, LLC and GOOGLE DEEPMIND
Case Number: 24-1705
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Request for extension of time to file docketing statement. [ # 8 ] To the extent that the appellant seeks an extension of time, the request is GRANTED only to the extent that the appellant shall file her Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by July 17, 2024. SCR [9] [7388353] [24-1705] (PS) [Entered: 06/17/2024 12:38 PM]
June 14, 2024 Filing 8 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rose Meacham to extend time to file the docketing statement [8] [7388192] [24-1705] (CAG) [Entered: 06/14/2024 04:56 PM]
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Accommodations for Disabilities Created by Defendants [ # 5 ]. A review of this courts docket shows that the appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending in the district court. This court will resolve the appellants request for counsel and accommodations after the district court rules on that motion. To the extent that the appellant requests more time to file her docketing statement, the request is GRANTED. The appellant shall file her overdue Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by 07/03/2024. The clerk will resend the appellant a copy of this courts instructions for preparing a docketing statement so the appellant may familiarize herself with the information that must be included in a Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement. In her docketing statement, the appellant should attempt to provide the information listed in the Pro Se Instructions, particularly the date of the judgment or order being challenged in this appeal. SCR [7] [7382957] [24-1705] (MAN) [Entered: 05/17/2024 09:47 AM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rose Meacham. [6] [7380298] [24-1705] (EF) [Entered: 05/03/2024 02:16 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rose Meacham for appointment of counsel and accomodations for disabilities created by defendants. [5] [7380284] [24-1705] (EF) [Entered: 05/03/2024 01:58 PM]
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Motion to extend time to file docketing statement. To the extent that appellant seeks an extension of time, IT IS ORDERED that the request is GRANTED only to the extent that the appellant shall file her Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by June 3, 2024. The clerk shall send the appellant this courts instructions for preparing a docketing statement, so that the appellant may familiarize herself with the information that should be included in a docketing statement. In her docketing statement, the appellant should attempt to provide the information listed in the Pro Se Instructions, particularly the date of the judgment or order being challenged in this appeal. To the extent that the appellant seeks appointment of counsel, that request should be made in a separate motion that specifically makes such a request and includes reasons in support. The appellant is reminded that the filing of a motion for appointment of counsel does not relieve her of the obligation to file a Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement. [ # 3 ] CDH [4] [7380236] [24-1705] (AP) [Entered: 05/03/2024 12:17 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rose Meacham to extend time to file the docketing statement [3] [7380087] [24-1705] (CAH) [Entered: 05/02/2024 04:30 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7378881] [24-1705] (PS) [Entered: 04/26/2024 01:09 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Rose Meacham by 05/02/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/10/2024. [1] [7378876] [24-1705] (PS) [Entered: 04/26/2024 01:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rose Meacham v. University of Illinois, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE MEACHAM
Represented By: Rose Meacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE DEEPMIND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?