Jalam Smith v. Lutheran University Association Inc.
Plaintiff: JALAM V. SMITH
Defendant: LUTHERAN UNIVERSITY ASSOCIATION INC.
Case Number: 24-1710
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Filing 6 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Jalam V. Smith. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/08/2024 for Lutheran University Association Inc.. REMINDER: If a case is designated to proceed to oral argument, hearing notices will be mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [6] [7386889] [24-1710] (CAG) [Entered: 06/07/2024 03:38 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jalam V. Smith. [5] [7381925] [24-1710] (PS) [Entered: 05/13/2024 02:40 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jalam V. Smith. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7380913] [24-1710] (JR) [Entered: 05/07/2024 11:51 AM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Monica H. Khetarpal for Appellee Lutheran University Association Inc.. [3] [7379132] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1710] [3] [7379132] [24-1710]--[Edited 04/29/2024 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Khetarpal, Monica) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:46 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Casey Leech for Appellee Lutheran University Association Inc.. [2] [7379129] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1710] (Leech, John) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:42 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 05/10/2024. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jalam V. Smith by 05/02/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/05/2024 for Jalam V. Smith. [1] [7379054] [24-1710] (FP) [Entered: 04/29/2024 10:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jalam Smith v. Lutheran University Association Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JALAM V. SMITH
Represented By: Jalam V. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUTHERAN UNIVERSITY ASSOCIATION INC.
Represented By: John Casey Leech
Represented By: Monica H. Khetarpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?