Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance, et al v. Simon H. Clark
Plaintiff: GRIFFIN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC and HASELECT MEDICAL RECEIVABLES LITIGATION FINANCE FUND INTERNATIONAL S.P.
Defendant: SIMON H. CLARK
Case Number: 24-1883
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amanda J. Alasauskas for Appellee Simon H. Clark. [10] [7390544] (L-No; E-Yes; R-Yes) [24-1883]--[Edited 06/28/2024 by FP to reflect that atty. Alasauskas is added to the docket.] (Alasauskas, Amanda) [Entered: 06/28/2024 10:30 AM]
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 08/26/2024 for Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P.. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/25/2024 for Simon H. Clark. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/16/2024 for Appellants Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P. JB [7390476] [24-1883] (FP) [Entered: 06/28/2024 08:57 AM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) William Patterson for party(s) Appellee Simon H. Clark, in case 24-1883 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney William D. Patterson for Appellee Simon H. Clark. [8] [7387365] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1883]--[Edited 06/11/2024 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Patterson, William) [Entered: 06/11/2024 01:19 PM]
June 4, 2024 Filing 7 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7386144] [24-1883] (Cronin, Thomas) [Entered: 06/04/2024 12:12 PM]
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 07/26/2024 for Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/26/2024 for Simon H. Clark. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/16/2024 for Appellants Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P. JB [7384885] [24-1883] (MAN) [Entered: 05/28/2024 01:49 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Wednesday, June 26, 2024 at 2:00p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [5] [7384884] [24-1883] (MAN) [Entered: 05/28/2024 01:47 PM]
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellants shall file an amended docketing statement that provides a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before June 4, 2024. (See order for further details) JXK [4] [7384745] [24-1883] (PS) [Entered: 05/28/2024 10:00 AM]
May 24, 2024 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas C. Cronin for Appellants Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P.. [3] [7384359] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1883] (Cronin, Thomas) [Entered: 05/24/2024 09:24 AM]
May 24, 2024 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7384348] [24-1883] (Cronin, Thomas) [Entered: 05/24/2024 08:48 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P. by 05/24/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 06/03/2024. Appellants' brief due on or before 07/01/2024 for Griffin Asset Management, LLC and Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance Fund International S.P. [1] [7383561] [24-1883] (CG) [Entered: 05/21/2024 09:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Haselect Medical Receivables Litigation Finance, et al v. Simon H. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRIFFIN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HASELECT MEDICAL RECEIVABLES LITIGATION FINANCE FUND INTERNATIONAL S.P.
Represented By: Thomas C. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMON H. CLARK
Represented By: Amanda J. Alasauskas
Represented By: William Patterson
Represented By: Emily Jean Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?