Ana Bernal, et al v. Kohl's Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: CLARA ROA, AIMEE MARQUEZ, PATRICIA JUAREZ and ANA BERNAL
Defendant: KOHL'S, INC. and KOHL'S CORPORATION
Case Number: 24-2806
Filed: October 10, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [8] [7414951] [24-2806] (FP) [Entered: 10/31/2024 11:30 AM]
October 25, 2024 Filing 7 Filed Statement by Appellants Ana Bernal, Patricia Juarez, Aimee Marquez and Clara Roa to October 11, 2024 ORDER (Dkt. 002) for statement advising the court whether they will request in the district court that judgment be set out in a separate document. [7][7413939] [24-2806] (Pak, Albert) [Entered: 10/25/2024 07:06 PM]
October 25, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Respondents-Appellees' Statement in Response to the Court's October 11, 2024 Order by Appellees Kohl's Corporation and Kohl's, Inc.. [6] [7413937] [24-2806] (Mazzuchetti, Lauri) [Entered: 10/25/2024 06:17 PM]
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Ana Bernal, Patricia Juarez, Aimee Marquez and Clara Roa. [5] [7413461] [24-2806] (Pak, Albert) [Entered: 10/24/2024 11:49 AM]
October 16, 2024 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Ana Bernal, Patricia Juarez, Aimee Marquez and Clara Roa. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7411778] [24-2806] (Pak, Albert) [Entered: 10/16/2024 10:12 PM]
October 16, 2024 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Albert Y. Pak for Appellants Ana Bernal, Patricia Juarez, Aimee Marquez and Clara Roa. [3] [7411777] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-2806] (Pak, Albert) [Entered: 10/16/2024 10:10 PM]
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record indicates that the district court has not entered a judgment under Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that both appellants and appellee shall file, on or before October 25, 2024, a statement advising the court whether they will request in the district court that judgment be set out in a separate document. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(d). JXK [2] [7410933] [24-2806] (AP) [Entered: 10/11/2024 02:25 PM]
October 10, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Ana Bernal, Patricia Juarez, Aimee Marquez and Clara Roa by 10/16/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/19/2024 for Ana Bernal, Patricia Juarez, Aimee Marquez and Clara Roa. Transcript information sheet due by 10/24/2024. [1] [7410833] [24-2806] (VG) [Entered: 10/11/2024 10:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ana Bernal, et al v. Kohl's Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARA ROA
Represented By: Albert Young Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIMEE MARQUEZ
Represented By: Albert Young Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA JUAREZ
Represented By: Albert Young Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA BERNAL
Represented By: Albert Young Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHL'S, INC.
Represented By: Lauri A. Mazzuchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHL'S CORPORATION
Represented By: Lauri A. Mazzuchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?