Tom Brady, et al v. National Football League, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellee: Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins and Antawan Walker, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant - Appellant: National Football League, Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Panthers Football, LLC, The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, PDB Sports, Ltd., doing business as The Denver Broncos Football Club, Ltd., The Detroit Lions, Inc., Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, The Oakland Raiders, L.P., Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, The St. Louis Rams LLC, Chargers Football Company, LLC, San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Football Northwest LLC, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Tennessee Football, Inc. and Pro-Football, Inc.
Case Number: 11-1898
Filed: April 26, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Antitrust

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 8, 2011 Summary Tom Brady, et al. v. National Football League, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2011 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed by David G. Feher for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/27/2011 [3781544] [11-1898] (DGF)
April 27, 2011 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed by David L. Greenspan for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/27/2011 [3781540] [11-1898] (DLG)
April 27, 2011 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed by Bruce S. Meyer for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/27/2011 [3781347] [11-1898] (BSM)
April 26, 2011 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed by Timothy R. Thornton for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/26/2011 [3781255] [11-1898] (TRT)
April 26, 2011 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed by James W. Quinn for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/26/2011 [3781218] [11-1898] (JWQ)
April 26, 2011 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffrey L. Kessler for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/26/2011 [3781214] [11-1898] (JLK)
April 26, 2011 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed by Barbara Podlucky Berens for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/26/2011 [3781161] [11-1898] (BPB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed by Andrew S. Tulumello for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/26/2011 [3781151] [11-1898] (AT)
April 26, 2011 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed by Theodore B. Olson for Appellees Mr. Tom Brady, Mr. Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Mr. Ben Leber, Mr. Logan Mankins, Mr. Peyton Manning, Mr. Von Miller, Mr. Brian Robison, Mr. Osi Umenyiora and Mr. Mike Vrabel w/service 04/26/2011 [3781139] [11-1898] (TO)
April 26, 2011 Filing 11 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC - Separate Appendix w/service 04/26/2011 [3781098] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 10 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC. - FOR CAL. [3781095] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed by William A. Isaacson for Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC w/service 04/26/2011 [3781092] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed by David Boies for Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC w/service 04/26/2011 [3781090] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed by Aaron D. Van Oort for Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC w/service 04/26/2011 [3781087] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel J. Connolly for Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC w/service 04/26/2011 [3781085] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed by Paul D. Clement for Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC w/service 04/26/2011 [3781083] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed by Gregg H. Levy for Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC w/service 04/26/2011 [3781082] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin C. Block for Appellants Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, L.P., Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, NFL, New England Patriots L.P., New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C., New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers LLC, Pro-Football, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited, Tennessee Football, Inc., The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The Detroit Lions, Inc., The Oakland Raiders, L.P. and The St. Louis Rams LLC w/service 04/26/2011 [3781079] [11-1898] (BCB)
April 26, 2011 Filing 2 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, 4/26/11 judgment, 4/25/11 memorandum opinion and order, and district court docket entries. [3781038] [11-1898] (CBC)
April 26, 2011 Filing 1 Civil case docketed. [3781028] [11-1898] (CBC)

Search for this case: Tom Brady, et al v. National Football League, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Tom Brady
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Drew Brees
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Vincent Jackson
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Ben Leber
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Logan Mankins
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Peyton Manning
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Von Miller
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Brian Robison
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Osi Umenyiora
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Mike Vrabel
Represented By: Barbara Podlucky Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Carl Eller
Represented By: Arthur N. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Priest Holmes
Represented By: Arthur N. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Obafemi Ayanbadejo
Represented By: Arthur N. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Ryan Collins
Represented By: Arthur N. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Antawan Walker, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Arthur N. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: National Football League
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Arizona Cardinals Football Club, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Buffalo Bills, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Panthers Football, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Cincinnati Bengals, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: PDB Sports, Ltd., doing business as The Denver Broncos Football Club, Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: The Detroit Lions, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Green Bay Packers, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Houston NFL Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Indianapolis Colts, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Miami Dolphins, Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: New England Patriots L.P.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: New Orleans Louisiana Saints, L.L.C.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: New York Football Giants, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: New York Jets LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: The Oakland Raiders, L.P.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Philadelphia Eagles, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Pittsburgh Steelers LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: The St. Louis Rams LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Chargers Football Company, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: San Francisco Forty Niners, Limited
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Football Northwest LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Buccaneers Limited Partnership
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Pro-Football, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?