Inez Hunter v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Inez Hunter
Defendant / Appellee: Ford Motor Company, in Dearborn MI, Citi Financial Auto, ("CFA") a corporation in Bedford, TX, Hastings Automotive Inc., ("HAI"), in Hastings, MN, Dion Carpenter, an individual, Doug Ericksen, an individual and John Does, I through X, sued in their individual and official capacities whose identities are not yet known
Case Number: 16-1042
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2016 MANDATE ISSUED. [4403143] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 05/25/2016 04:22 PM]
May 4, 2016 PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Roger L. Wollman, Pasco M. Bowman and Diana E. Murphy (UNPUBLISHED) [4395299] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 05/04/2016 09:36 AM]
May 4, 2016 JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion.. ROGER L. WOLLMAN, PASCO M. BOWMAN and DIANA E. MURPHY Scrg May 2016 [4395307] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 05/04/2016 09:44 AM]
May 2, 2016 CASE SUBMITTED Screening Case Submission before Judges Roger L. Wollman, Pasco M. Bowman, Diana E. Murphy in St. Louis [4394341] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 05/02/2016 11:56 AM]
February 25, 2016 RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies [4371072] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 02/25/2016 10:58 AM]
February 25, 2016 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Ms. Inez Hunter. w/service 02/23/2016 , Length: 24 pages [4371068] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 02/25/2016 10:54 AM]
February 16, 2016 Paper copies Appellee/Respondent brief, [ # 4365335-2 ] filed by Citi Financial Auto 10 paper copies received. Reply brief of Inez Hunter due 02/19/2016 [4368442] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 02/18/2016 10:26 AM]
February 11, 2016 ADDENDUM of APPELLEE FILED by Appellee Citi Financial Auto , w/service 02/11/2016 [4366039] [16-1042] (SRD) [Entered: 02/11/2016 11:49 AM]
February 10, 2016 Addendum of APPELLEE submitted for review by Citi Financial Auto [4365691] [16-1042] (JA) [Entered: 02/10/2016 02:30 PM]
February 9, 2016 BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Citi Financial Auto, w/service 02/09/2016 , Length: 11 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Citi Financial Auto due 02/16/2016 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4365335] [16-1042] (SRD) [Entered: 02/09/2016 04:12 PM]
February 9, 2016 LETTER from Appellees Dion Carpenter, Doug Ericksen and Hastings Automotive Inc. notifying the Court they will not be filing a brief in this case - - FOR CAL. w/service 02/08/2016 [4365355] [16-1042] (MLS) [Entered: 02/09/2016 04:42 PM]
February 8, 2016 APPELLEE brief of Dion Carpenter, Doug Ericksen and Hastings Automotive Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4364762] [16-1042] COUNSEL WILL RESUBMIT AS A LETTER NOTIFYING THE COURT THEY WILL NOT BE FILING A BRIEF.--[Edited 02/09/2016 by SRD] (MLS) [Entered: 02/08/2016 03:17 PM]
February 8, 2016 LETTER from Appellee Ford Motor Company notifying the Court they will not be filing a brief in this case - - FOR CAL. w/service 02/08/2016 [4364722] [16-1042] (AMP) [Entered: 02/08/2016 02:36 PM]
February 8, 2016 Addendum of APPELLEE submitted for review by Citi Financial Auto [4364703] [16-1042] COUNSEL WILL RESUBMIT WITH A COVER PAGE--[Edited 02/09/2016 by SRD] (JA) [Entered: 02/08/2016 02:00 PM]
February 8, 2016 APPEARANCE filed by Joy R. Anderson for Appellee Citi Financial Auto w/service 02/08/2016 [4364610] [16-1042] (JA) [Entered: 02/08/2016 11:41 AM]
February 8, 2016 APPELLEE brief of Citi Financial Auto submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4364700] [16-1042] (JA) [Entered: 02/08/2016 01:57 PM]
January 20, 2016 LETTER from Appellee Ford Motor Company regarding Removal of Brian L. Vander Pol as Counsel. w/service 01/20/2016 [4357808] [16-1042] (VCD) [Entered: 01/20/2016 01:57 PM]
January 19, 2016 DOCUMENT FILED - Copy of envelope addressed to attorney David Kelam Cole, III returned to Ms. Hunter as "undeliverable." (Envelope photo copied and filed per Ms. Hunter's request.) filed by Ms. Inez Hunter. w/service 01/19/2016 by USCA8. [4357248] [16-1042] (JMM) [Entered: 01/19/2016 01:31 PM]
January 15, 2016 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Ford Motor Company. - FOR CAL [4356544] [16-1042] (VCD) [Entered: 01/15/2016 09:27 AM]
January 14, 2016 APPEARANCE filed by Angela M. Porter for Appellee Ford Motor Company w/service 01/14/2016 [4356339] [16-1042] (VCD) [Entered: 01/14/2016 02:46 PM]
January 14, 2016 APPEARANCE filed by Vernle C. Durocher, Jr. for Appellee Ford Motor Company w/service 01/14/2016 [4356336] [16-1042] (VCD) [Entered: 01/14/2016 02:45 PM]
January 8, 2016 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEFw/addendum filed by Ms. Inez Hunter. w/service 01/08/2016 , Length: 33 pages Brief of Dion Carpenter, Citi Financial Auto, John Does, Doug Ericksen, Ford Motor Company and Hastings Automotive Inc. due on 02/08/2016 [4354406] [16-1042] (JPP) [Entered: 01/08/2016 03:59 PM]
January 7, 2016 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 12/1/2015. [4353487] [16-1042] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/07/2016 09:30 AM]
January 7, 2016 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Inez Hunter due 02/16/2016. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4353489] [16-1042] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/07/2016 09:31 AM]
January 7, 2016 Tendered Appellant's Brief and Appendix received from Appellant Ms. Inez Hunter. [4353495] [16-1042] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/07/2016 09:36 AM]
January 7, 2016 Civil case docketed. [4353475] [16-1042] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/07/2016 09:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Inez Hunter v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Inez Hunter
Represented By: Inez Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ford Motor Company, in Dearborn MI
Represented By: Vernle Charles Durocher Jr.
Represented By: Angela Maryssa Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citi Financial Auto, ("CFA") a corporation in Bedford, TX
Represented By: Joy Anderson
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hastings Automotive Inc., ("HAI"), in Hastings, MN
Represented By: Mark Lee Scholle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dion Carpenter, an individual
Represented By: Mark Lee Scholle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doug Ericksen, an individual
Represented By: Mark Lee Scholle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, I through X, sued in their individual and official capacities whose identities are not yet known
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?