John Carter v. William Muldoon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Dave Stolz, individual capacity, Does 1-25 inclusive, William Muldoon, individual capacity and Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center
Plaintiff / Appellant: John M. Carter, and on behalf of others Similarly situated
Case Number: 19-1019
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by James D. Smith for Appellees Does 1-25 inclusive, Mr. William Muldoon, Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center and Mr. Dave Stolz w/service 02/28/2019 [4761345] [19-1019] (JDS) [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:09 PM]
February 1, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT John M. Carter due 03/13/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4751989] [19-1019] (TMF) [Entered: 02/01/2019 08:36 AM]
February 1, 2019 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1019: paid - cs] Paid in dist.ct 1/29/19. [4751986] [19-1019] (TMF) [Entered: 02/01/2019 08:34 AM]
January 4, 2019 CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 02/01/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4742269] [19-1019] (TMF) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:21 PM]
January 4, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 12/31/18, docket entries, Order 3/21/18, Memoradum & Order 5/01/2018, Memorandum & Order 12/19/18, Judgment 12/19/18, Order 01/02/19. [4742264] [19-1019]--[Edited 01/09/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:16 PM]
January 4, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4742212] [19-1019] (TMF) [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Carter v. William Muldoon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dave Stolz, individual capacity
Represented By: Jessica Forch
Represented By: James D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does 1-25 inclusive
Represented By: James D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Muldoon, individual capacity
Represented By: Jessica Forch
Represented By: James D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nebraska Law Enforcement Training Center
Represented By: Jessica Forch
Represented By: James D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John M. Carter, and on behalf of others Similarly situated
Represented By: John M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?