Timothy Walter v. Commissioner, Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant: Timothy James Walter
Defendant / Appellee: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 19-1073
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 CLERK ORDER: [ # 4755909-2 ] Granting motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy James Walter. Brief of Timothy James Walter due 03/19/2019 [4755925] [19-1073] (JMM) [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:55 PM]
February 12, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 03/19/2019, filed by Appellant Mr. Timothy James Walter w/service 02/12/2019. [4755909] [19-1073] (JMM) [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:44 PM]
January 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Michael A. Moss for Appellee Commissioner, Social Security Administration w/service 01/15/2019 [4746094] [19-1073] (MAM) [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:29 PM]
January 14, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Kristin E. Olson for Appellee Commissioner, Social Security Administration w/service 01/14/2019 [4745443] [19-1073] (KEO) [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:07 AM]
January 10, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Timothy James Walter due 02/19/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4744492] [19-1073] (AEV) [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:44 AM]
January 10, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Judicial Review Decision 12/6/18, Judgment 12/10/18, docket entries, [4744491] [19-1073] (AEV) [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:44 AM]
January 10, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4744479] [19-1073] (AEV) [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timothy Walter v. Commissioner, Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy James Walter
Represented By: Timothy James Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michael Allen Moss
Represented By: Kristin Elaine Olson
Represented By: Mary Clare Luxa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?