Sok Kong v. City of Burnsville, et al
Defendant / Appellant: Taylor Jacobs, in his individual and official capacity, Maksim Yakovlev, in his individual and official capacity, John Mott, in his individual and official capacity and City of Burnsville
Plaintiff / Appellee: Sok Kong, Trustee for Next-of-Kin of Map Kong, Decedent
Case Number: 19-1101
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 2 volumes, Location STL, Comments: 3 Copies Appellant's Appendix Volumes I and II [4765265] [19-1101] (YML) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:44 PM]
March 11, 2019 RECORD FILED - SEALED APPENDIX, 1 volume, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: 3 Copies of Appellants' Sealed Appendix Volume III [4765257] [19-1101] (YML) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:37 PM]
March 11, 2019 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4763241-2 ] filed by City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4765242] [19-1101] (YML) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:24 PM]
March 6, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev. w/service 03/06/2019 , Length: 11,086 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM City of Burnsville, Taylor Jacobs, John Mott and Maksim Yakovlev due 03/11/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Sok Kong due on 04/05/2019 [4763241] [19-1101] (YML) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:32 AM]
March 6, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev , w/service 03/06/2019 [4763228] [19-1101] (YML) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:27 AM]
March 5, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4762986] [19-1101] (PSC) [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:52 PM]
March 5, 2019 APPELLANT brief of City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4762984] [19-1101] (PSC) [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:49 PM]
March 4, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4762269-2 ] motion to seal filed by Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Maksim Yakovlev, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Taylor Jacobs. The Court is hereby sealing the following: Volume III of Appellants' Appendix. [4762274] [19-1101] (YML) [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:37 PM]
March 4, 2019 MOTION to seal portion of appendix, filed by Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev w/service 03/04/2019. [4762269] [19-1101] (YML) [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:34 PM]
January 29, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/25/2018, No. of Pgs.: 45, Court Reporter: Bebault, Carla R [4750484] [19-1101] (STL) [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:17 AM]
January 24, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of Order Striking Settlement Conference pending Eighth Circuit appeal dated 01/23/2019. [4749019] [19-1101] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:19 PM]
January 21, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev - w/service 01/21/2019. [4747695] [19-1101] (PSC) [Entered: 01/21/2019 12:45 PM]
January 21, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev. Transcript ordered[4747693] [19-1101] (PSC) [Entered: 01/21/2019 09:42 AM]
January 21, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev - Separate Appendix - w/service 01/21/2019 [4747692] [19-1101] (PSC) [Entered: 01/21/2019 09:33 AM]
January 17, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Joseph E. Flynn for Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev w/service 01/17/2019 [4747146] [19-1101] (JEF) [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:48 PM]
January 17, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Patrick S. Collins for Appellants City of Burnsville, Mr. Taylor Jacobs, Mr. John Mott and Mr. Maksim Yakovlev w/service 01/17/2019 [4747129] [19-1101] (PSC) [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:37 PM]
January 16, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Richard Student for Appellee Mr. Sok Kong w/service 01/16/2019 [4746314] [19-1101] (RES) [Entered: 01/16/2019 08:11 AM]
January 15, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/25/2019. Appendix due 03/06/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, City of Burnsville, Taylor Jacobs, John Mott and Maksim Yakovlev due 03/06/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4746111] [19-1101] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:45 PM]
January 15, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum opinion and order of 12/14/2018 [4746101] [19-1101] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:38 PM]
January 15, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4746080] [19-1101] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sok Kong v. City of Burnsville, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Taylor Jacobs, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Maksim Yakovlev, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Mott, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: City of Burnsville
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sok Kong, Trustee for Next-of-Kin of Map Kong, Decedent
Represented By: Richard E. Student
Represented By: Steven J. Meshbesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?