Farass Ali v. Joel Brott
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Ronald Vitiello, Acting Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew G. Whitaker, Attorney General and Peter B. Berg, Director, St. Paul Field Office Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Undetermined: Farass Ali and Joel L. Brott, Sheriff, Sherburne County
Case Number: 19-1244
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 16, 2019 Summary Ali v. Brott

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 MOTION to strike previously filed 28(j) citation, Doc. No. [ # 4767019-2 ], 28(j) citation for Calendar, Doc. No. [ # 4767019-3 ], filed by Attorney Mr. Sergio Sarkany for Appellant Joel L. Brott w/service 03/15/2019. [4767275] [19-1244] (SS) [Entered: 03/15/2019 01:54 PM]
March 14, 2019 28(j) citation filed by Appellee Farass Ali w/service 03/14/2019 - FOR CAL [4767019] [19-1244] (IB) [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:01 PM]
March 12, 2019 ARGUED & SUBMITTED in St. Paul to Judges Raymond W. Gruender, Duane Benton, L. Steven Grasz on 03/12/2019 Sergio Sarkany for Appellant Joel L. Brott Ian Bratlie for Appellee Farass Ali Rebuttal by Sergio Sarkany for Joel L. Brott RECORDED. # Click Here To Listen to Oral Argument [4765590] [19-1244] (MMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:41 PM]
March 11, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Teresa J. Nelson for Appellee Farass Ali w/service 03/11/2019 [4765143] [19-1244] (TN) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:08 PM]
March 8, 2019 Paper copies Appellee/Respondent brief, [ # 4763221-2 ] filed by Farass Ali 10 paper copies received. [4764412] [19-1244] [4764412] [19-1244]--[Edited 03/08/2019 by JPP] (JPP) [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:37 PM]
March 8, 2019 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief (with attached exhibits which have been filed under seal), [ # 4763211-2 ] filed by Joel L. Brott 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4764402] [19-1244] (JPP) [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:29 PM]
March 6, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4763202-2 ] motion to seal filed by Mr. Sergio Sarkany. The Court is hereby sealing the following: exhibits A-C. [4763203] [19-1244] (JPP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:03 AM]
March 6, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Farass Ali, w/service 03/05/2019 , Length: 7,053 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Farass Ali due 03/11/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4763221] [19-1244] (JPP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:20 AM]
March 6, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Joel L. Brott. w/service 03/05/2019 , Length: 6,497 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Joel L. Brott due 03/11/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4763211] [19-1244] (JPP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:15 AM]
March 6, 2019 RECORD FILED - EXHIBITS, 1 volumes, Comments: Appellee exhibits A-C (FILED UNDER SEAL) [4763225] [19-1244] (JPP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:24 AM]
March 5, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Joel L. Brott submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4762999] [19-1244] (SS) [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:50 PM]
March 5, 2019 MOTION to seal exhibits in support of brief filed by Attorney Mr. Sergio Sarkany for Appellant Joel L. Brott w/service 03/05/2019. [4763202] [19-1244] (JPP) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:02 AM]
March 5, 2019 APPELLEE brief of Farass Ali submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4762992] [19-1244] (IB) [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:03 PM]
February 22, 2019 ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Sergio Sarkany for Joel L. Brott for argument in March, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4759037] [19-1244] (SS) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:42 AM]
February 21, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: Upon further consideration of the motion for emergency stay and the response in opposition, a temporary stay is granted pending further order of the court. The parties are directed to file simultaneous briefs on the merits by Tuesday, March 5, 2019. The case will be set for oral argument on Tuesday, March 12, 2019 in St. Paul, Minnesota. Each side will be allotted 15 minutes for oral argument. Court convenes at 9:00 a.m. The pending motion to seal Exhibits A-D is granted. [ # 4753578-2 ] [ # 4753698-2 ] Adp Feb 2019 [4758590] [19-1244] (JPP) [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:42 AM]
February 21, 2019 SET FOR ARGUMENT - CASE ADDED TO CALENDAR for Oral Argument in St. Paul on Tuesday, 03/12/2019. To be heard before Judges Raymond W. Gruender, Duane Benton, L. Steven Grasz. The courtoom deputy will be Michelle Hyatt. To complete the Response Form go to http://media.ca8.uscourts.gov/newcoa/forms/OralArgumentResponseForm.pdf [19-1244] (TAB) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:35 PM]
February 21, 2019 ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Ian Bratlie for Farass Ali for argument in March, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4758771] [19-1244] (IB) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:54 PM]
February 19, 2019 REPLY to response [ # 4756882-2 ] filed by Appellant Joel L. Brott w/service 02/19/2019. [4757554] [19-1244] (SS) [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:39 PM]
February 15, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion for emergency stay and response in opposition, a temporary stay is granted for seven days or February 22, 2019, pending further consideration. Adp Feb 2019 [4757231] [19-1244] (MDS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 04:52 PM]
February 14, 2019 RESPONSE to Emergency Motion for Stay [ # 4753578-2 ] filed by Appellee Farass Ali w/service 02/14/2019. [4756882] [19-1244]--[Edited 02/15/2019 by DMW-to show that this is a response; not a reply] (IB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 07:05 PM]
February 7, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Ian Bratlie for Appellee Farass Ali w/service 02/07/2019 [4754295] [19-1244] (IB) [Entered: 02/07/2019 10:36 AM]
February 6, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Sergio F. Sarkany for Appellant Joel L. Brott w/service 02/06/2019 [4753566] [19-1244] (SS) [Entered: 02/06/2019 08:44 AM]
February 6, 2019 MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. Sergio Sarkany for Appellant Joel L. Brott w/service 02/06/2019. [4753578] [19-1244] (SS) [Entered: 02/06/2019 08:55 AM]
February 6, 2019 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-D in Support of Motion for Stay, filed by Attorney Mr. Sergio Sarkany for Appellant Joel L. Brott w/service 02/06/2019. [4753698] [19-1244] (EDG) [Entered: 02/06/2019 10:27 AM]
February 5, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 1/7/19, Order denying motion for reconsideration 2/1/19, Order granting motion for stay 2/5/19. [4753492] [19-1244] (EDG) [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:44 PM]
February 5, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4753489] [19-1244] (EDG) [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Farass Ali v. Joel Brott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello, Acting Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G. Whitaker, Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter B. Berg, Director, St. Paul Field Office Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Farass Ali
Represented By: Ian Bratlie
Represented By: Teresa Nelson
Represented By: Sarah Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Joel L. Brott, Sheriff, Sherburne County
Represented By: Sergio Sarkany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?