Vanessa Cole v. Dennis Hutchins, et al
Defendant: City of Little Rock, A Municipality and Kenton Buckner, Individually and Officially
Defendant / Appellant: Dennis Hutchins, Individually
Plaintiff / Appellee: Vanessa Cole, As Personal Respresentative of the Estate of Roy Lee Richards, Jr., Deceased other Roy Lee Richards, Jr.
Case Number: 19-1399
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4774383-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Alexander Julian Betton. Brief of Dennis Hutchins due 04/29/2019. Appendix due on 04/29/2019 [4775481] [19-1399] (BNW) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:36 AM]
April 5, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/29/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Alexander Julian Betton for Appellant Mr. Dennis Hutchins w/service 04/05/2019. [4774383] [19-1399] (AJB) [Entered: 04/05/2019 09:08 AM]
March 19, 2019 UPDATED fee status - Paid to dist. ct. 3/18/19. [Case Number 19-1399: paid - cs] [4768432] [19-1399] (TMF) [Entered: 03/19/2019 03:35 PM]
March 7, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Alexander J. Betton for Appellant Mr. Dennis Hutchins w/service 03/07/2019 [4763798] [19-1399] (AJB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:58 AM]
March 7, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Michael J Laux for Appellee Ms. Vanessa Cole w/service 03/07/2019 [4763605] [19-1399] (MJL) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:34 AM]
February 27, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/08/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Dennis Hutchins due 04/08/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4760862] [19-1399] (TMF) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:14 PM]
February 27, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 2/25/19, docket entries, Opinion & Order 2/22/19. [4760861] [19-1399] (TMF) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:12 PM]
February 27, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4760855] [19-1399] (TMF) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanessa Cole v. Dennis Hutchins, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Dennis Hutchins, Individually
Represented By: Alexander Julian Betton
Represented By: Rick D. Hogan
Represented By: Thomas Milton Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Vanessa Cole, As Personal Respresentative of the Estate of Roy Lee Richards, Jr., Deceased other Roy Lee Richards, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Laux
Represented By: Lucas Rowan
Represented By: Judson C. Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Little Rock, A Municipality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton Buckner, Individually and Officially
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?