Ronnie Jackson v. Jeff Gutzmer, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Jeff Gutzmer, in their individual capacity, Michelle Smith, in their official capacity, Natalie Liesman, in their official capacity, Tom Roy, in his official capacity and Tammy Wherley, in their individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ronnie Jackson
Case Number: 19-1706
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 13, 2019 Ronnie Jackson v. Jeff Gutzmer

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Paper copies Appellee/Respondent brief, [ # 4790334-2 ] filed by Jeff Gutzmer, Natalie Liesman, Tom Roy, Ms. Michelle Smith and Ms. Tammy Wherley, 10 paper copies received. Reply brief of Ronnie Jackson due 06/13/2019 [4792060] [19-1706] (YML) [Entered: 05/29/2019 12:17 PM]
May 22, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Jeff Gutzmer, Natalie Liesman, Tom Roy, Ms. Michelle Smith and Ms. Tammy Wherley, Appellant's reply brief deadline will be set, based on the Certificate of Service in appellee's paper brief. w/service 05/22/2019 , Length: 26 pgs 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Jeff Gutzmer, Ronnie Jackson, Natalie Liesman, Tom Roy and Michelle Smith due 05/28/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4790334] [19-1706] (YML) [Entered: 05/22/2019 03:47 PM]
May 22, 2019 APPELLEE brief of Jeff Gutzmer, Natalie Liesman, Ms. Michelle Smith, Ms. Tammy Wherley and Tom Roy submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4790286] [19-1706] (KJ) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:45 PM]
April 22, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Ronnie Jackson. w/service 04/23/2019 , Length: 17 pgs Brief of Jeff Gutzmer, Natalie Liesman, Tom Roy, Michelle Smith and Tammy Wherley due on 05/22/2019 [4780422] [19-1706] (YML) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:19 AM]
April 11, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Kevin Jonassen for Appellees Jeff Gutzmer, Natalie Liesman, Tom Roy, Ms. Michelle Smith and Ms. Tammy Wherley w/service 04/11/2019 [4776855] [19-1706] (KJ) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:27 PM]
April 8, 2019 LETTER from Appellant Mr. Ronnie Jackson inquiring as to the status of the case, w/service 04/02/2019. I sent him a copy of his docket sheet. [4775165] [19-1706] (MMH) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:35 PM]
April 4, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: BRIEF OF APPELLANT Ronnie Jackson due 05/14/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4774268] [19-1706] (MMH) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:44 PM]
April 4, 2019 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4774248] [19-1706] (MMH) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:21 PM]
April 4, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report and Recommendation 9/28/18, Order Adopting R&R 2/27/19, Judgment 3/1/19, and Order granting IFP 3/28/19 [4774213] [19-1706] (MMH) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:48 PM]
April 4, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4774197] [19-1706]--[Edited 04/04/2019 by MMH, incorrect letter has been locked] (MMH) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ronnie Jackson v. Jeff Gutzmer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff Gutzmer, in their individual capacity
Represented By: Kevin Jonassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michelle Smith, in their official capacity
Represented By: Kevin Jonassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Natalie Liesman, in their official capacity
Represented By: Kevin Jonassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tom Roy, in his official capacity
Represented By: Kevin Jonassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tammy Wherley, in their individual capacity
Represented By: Kevin Jonassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ronnie Jackson
Represented By: Ronnie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?