Lee Reddix v. Arkansas Dept of Workforce Svc
Defendant / Appellee: Arkansas Department of Workforce Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lee Reddix
Case Number: 19-1899
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 3, 2020 Lee Reddix v. Arkansas Dept of Workforce Svc

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 CLERK ORDER: Appellant's brief was due on 06/10/2019, but has not been filed. It is hereby ordered that appellant show cause, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Lee Reddix due 07/02/2019 [4799153] [19-1899] (AMT) [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:40 PM]
June 14, 2019 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1899: paid - cs] [4797809] [19-1899] (CMH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 10:05 AM]
June 14, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of receipt for payment of appellate docketing and filing fees on 6/13/2019. [4797808] [19-1899] (CMH) [Entered: 06/14/2019 10:04 AM]
May 24, 2019 CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 06/14/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4790936] [19-1899] (CMH) [Entered: 05/24/2019 09:07 AM]
May 1, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Opinion & Order and Judgment both dated 3/31/2019. [4783617] [19-1899] (CMH) [Entered: 05/01/2019 05:26 PM]
May 1, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/10/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Lee Reddix due 06/10/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4783618] [19-1899] (CMH) [Entered: 05/01/2019 05:27 PM]
May 1, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4783612] [19-1899] (CMH) [Entered: 05/01/2019 05:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lee Reddix v. Arkansas Dept of Workforce Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Arkansas Department of Workforce Services
Represented By: KaTina Hodge-Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lee Reddix
Represented By: Jessica S. Yarbrough
Represented By: James Fitzgerald Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?