Randy Hammermeister v. Cal Ludeman, et al
Defendant / Appellee: David Bornus, Emily Johnson Piper, Katherine McDowell, Tom Lundquist, all in their official and individual capacities, Jane Doe, whose names are unknown, Scott Benoit, Joelle Deppa, Yvette Andersen, Jenna Younker, Cristy Leonard Rivers, Laine Jahnke, Susan Persons, Shelby Richardson, Shannon Elke, Sara Kulas, Dr. Jane Ward, Darlene L. Harris, Darci Wikeluis, formerly known as Darci Lewis, Jannine Hebert, Ross Peterson, Shaina Connolly, Dennis Benson, Nancy Johnston, Terry Kniesel, Cal Ludeman, Dr. Peter Puffer, Dr. David Prescott, John Doe, Dr. Elizabeth Peterson, Lucinda Jesson, Dana Osborne, Dan Maki, Joanne Christensen, Katherine Lockie, Samantha Sheeran, Bruce Wagner, Steve Sayovitz, Angie Parrent, Tara Osborne-Leivian and Kevin Moser
Plaintiff / Appellant: Randy Earl Hammermeister
Case Number: 19-1970
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Brandon Boese for Appellees Scott Benoit, David Bornus, Joelle Deppa, Darlene L. Harris, Ms. Jannine Hebert, Ms. Nancy Johnston, Mr. Terry Kniesel, Sara Kulas, Cristy Leonard Rivers, Katherine Lockie, Katherine McDowell, Kevin Moser, Dana Osborne, Tara Osborne-Leivian, Elizabeth Peterson, Ross Peterson, Ms. Emily Johnson Piper, Mr. Peter Puffer, Shelby Richardson, Steve Sayovitz, Samantha Sheeran, Jenna Younker, Mr. Dennis Benson, Ms. Lucinda Jesson, Cal Ludeman and Tom Lundquist w/service 06/28/2019 [4802985] [19-1970] (BLB) [Entered: 06/28/2019 11:00 AM]
June 27, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Appellants in 19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992 w/service by USCA8 06/27/2019. Length: 41 pages, 5 copies received Brief of Appellees due on 07/29/2019 [4802463] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992]--[Edited to indicate 5 copies rec'd 06/27/2019 by HAG] (HAG) [Entered: 06/27/2019 10:14 AM]
June 27, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: Appellants' motion for appointment of counsel has been considered by the court, and the motion [ # 4797177-2 ] is denied. While this motion was pending before the court, the appellants filed a joint brief of 41 pages. While the brief is overlength, under the circumstances the filing of a consolidated brief by all appellants warrants an expansion of the page limits, and the clerk is directed to file the brief. Appellants are cautioned, however, that they must seek advance permission to file an overlength reply brief if they cannot file a reply brief which complies with the 15-page limit for reply briefs. Appellees' brief is due July 29, 2019. Adp June 2019 [4802441] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (HAG) [Entered: 06/27/2019 09:56 AM]
June 26, 2019 Tendered Overlength Brief submitted by appellants received from Appellant Terry Lee Branson in 19-1956, Appellant Kenneth Donald Hand in 19-1962, Appellant Mr. Peter Gerard Lonergan in 19-1964, Appellant Randy Earl Hammermeister in 19-1970, Appellant Mr. Brad Ronald Stevens in 19-1973, Appellant Steven Merrill Hogy in 19-1976, Appellant Mr. Peter Allan, Sr. in 19-1987, Appellant Mr. Bradley Wayne Foster in 19-1990, Appellant Mr. Kevin Scott Karsjens in 19-1992 [4802250] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (HAG) [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:52 PM]
June 18, 2019 LETTER from Appellant Terry Lee Branson in 19-1956, Appellant Kenneth Donald Hand in 19-1962, Appellant Mr. Peter Gerard Lonergan in 19-1964, Appellant Randy Earl Hammermeister in 19-1970, Appellant Mr. Brad Ronald Stevens in 19-1973, Appellant Steven Merrill Hogy in 19-1976, Appellant Mr. Peter Allan, Sr. in 19-1987, Appellant Mr. Bradley Wayne Foster in 19-1990, Appellant Mr. Kevin Scott Karsjens in 19-1992 regarding prison mail and docketing of cases. w/service 07/01/2019 [4803829] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] *These matter has been addressed.* (MDS) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:44 PM]
June 13, 2019 MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellants Terry Lee Branson (19-1956), Kenneth Hand (19-1962), Peter Lonergan (19-1964), Randy Hammermeister (19-1970), Brad Stevens (19-1973), Steven Hogy (19-1976), Peter Allan, Sr. (19-1987), Bradley Foster (19-1990), Kevin Karsjens (19-1992) w/service 06/03/2019. [4797177] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (MMH) [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:16 AM]
May 15, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Original file of originating court shall serve as record on appeal. Appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. Clerk of originating court is requested to forward the file forthwith, together with any exhibits and documents maintained in paper format.. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Terry Lee Branson, Kenneth Donald Hand, Peter Gerard Lonergan, Randy Earl Hammermeister, Brad Ronald Stevens, Steven Merrill Hogy, Peter Allan Sr., Bradley Wayne Foster and Kevin Scott Karsjens due 06/24/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4787965] [19-1956, 19-1962, 19-1964, 19-1970, 19-1973, 19-1976, 19-1987, 19-1990, 19-1992] (MMH) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:05 PM]
May 10, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report & Recommendation 1/4/19, Order Adopting R&R 3/25/19, Amended Judgment 3/27/19, Order Granting IFP 5/8/19 [4786736] [19-1970] (MMH) [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:17 PM]
May 10, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4786727] [19-1970] (MMH) [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randy Hammermeister v. Cal Ludeman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Bornus
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emily Johnson Piper
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Katherine McDowell
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tom Lundquist, all in their official and individual capacities
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, whose names are unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Benoit
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joelle Deppa
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Yvette Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jenna Younker
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cristy Leonard Rivers
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laine Jahnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shelby Richardson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shannon Elke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sara Kulas
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Jane Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darlene L. Harris
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darci Wikeluis, formerly known as Darci Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jannine Hebert
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ross Peterson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shaina Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dennis Benson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Johnston
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Terry Kniesel
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cal Ludeman
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Peter Puffer
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. David Prescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Elizabeth Peterson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lucinda Jesson
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dana Osborne
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dan Maki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joanne Christensen
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Katherine Lockie
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samantha Sheeran
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bruce Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steve Sayovitz
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Angie Parrent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tara Osborne-Leivian
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin Moser
Represented By: Brandon L. Boese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Randy Earl Hammermeister
Represented By: Randy Earl Hammermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?