Janice Roberts v. Arkansas Dept of Workforce Svc
Plaintiff / Appellant: Janice L. Roberts
Defendant / Appellee: Arkansas Department of Workforce Services
Case Number: 19-2021
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4803863-3 ] motion ext of time to file record notices until July 12, 2019, filed by Appellant Janice L. Roberts.; Granting [ # 4803863-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Janice L. Roberts. Brief of Janice L. Roberts due 07/19/2019. Appendix due on 07/19/2019. [4804728] [19-2021] (CMD) [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:44 PM]
July 1, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 07/19/2019, for extension of time to file Brief of Appellant & Record Notices until 07/12/2019[4803863], filed by Appellant Janice L. Roberts w/service 07/01/2019. [4803863] [19-2021] (MS) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:41 PM]
July 1, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Maximillan Sprinkle for Appellant Janice L. Roberts w/service 07/01/2019 [4803862] [19-2021] (MS) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:35 PM]
May 20, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 07/01/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Janice L. Roberts due 07/01/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4789135] [19-2021] (CMH) [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:14 AM]
May 20, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Opinion & Order and Judgment both dated 4/17/2019. [4789132] [19-2021] (CMH) [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:08 AM]
May 20, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4789117] [19-2021] (CMH) [Entered: 05/20/2019 10:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Janice Roberts v. Arkansas Dept of Workforce Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Janice L. Roberts
Represented By: Maximillan Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Arkansas Department of Workforce Services
Represented By: KaTina Hodge-Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?