Dean Birkeland v. John Jorgenson, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Dean Birkeland, as trustee for the next of kin of John O. Birkeland
Defendant / Appellee: City of Roseville, Kyle Eckert, individually and acting in their official capacities as City of Roseville Police Officers, Joseph Robert Adams, individually and acting in their official capacities as City of Roseville Police Officers and John Edward Jorgenson, individually and acting in their official capacities as City of Roseville Police Officers
Case Number: 19-2172
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 RESPONSE in opposition to motion to dismiss case [ # 4811867-2 ] filed by Mr. James Raymond Behrenbrinker, I for Appellant Mr. Dean Birkeland and Ms. Karin Ciano for Appellant Mr. Dean Birkeland in 19-2172 , w/service 08/05/2019. [4815594] [19-2172]--[Edited to remove filing from No. 19-2086 08/05/2019 by AMT] (JRB) [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:57 AM]
August 5, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 01/25/2019, No. of Pgs.: 75, Court Reporter: Krenz, Lynne [4815496] [19-2172] (STL) [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:11 AM]
July 25, 2019 CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending ruling on the motion to dismiss filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick S. Collins for Appellees Mr. Joseph Robert Adams, City of Roseville, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. John Edward Jorgenson in 19-2172. [4812187] [19-2172, 19-2086] (BNW) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:45 PM]
July 25, 2019 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick S. Collins for Appellees Mr. Joseph Robert Adams, City of Roseville, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. John Edward Jorgenson w/service 07/25/2019. [4811867] [19-2172] (JEF) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:52 AM]
July 23, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick S. Collins for Appellees Mr. Joseph Robert Adams, City of Roseville, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. John Edward Jorgenson correcting [ # 4810476-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Appellees. [4811196] [19-2172]-[Edited 07/25/2019 by BNW] DOCUMENT LOCKED. Attorney to file new motion with coc attached. (PSC) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:28 PM]
July 23, 2019 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion to dismiss case, [ # 4810476-2 ], submitted by City of Roseville, Mr. John Edward Jorgenson, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. Joseph Robert Adams in 19-2172 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [19-2172] (BNW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:24 PM]
July 22, 2019 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Appellees Mr. Joseph Robert Adams, City of Roseville, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. John Edward Jorgenson w/service 07/22/2019. [4810476] [19-2172] --[Edited 07/25/2019 by BNW] DOCUMENT LOCKED. Attorney to file new motion with separate exhibits. (JEF) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:48 PM]
July 18, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4809612-2 ] motion to seal portion of appendix filed by Mr. Joseph E. Flynn and Mr. Patrick S. Collins for appellants/ cross- appellees. The Court is hereby sealing the following: Portion of Appendix. [4809613] [19-2086, 19-2172] (BNW) [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:36 PM]
July 18, 2019 MOTION to seal portion of appendix, filed by Mr. Patrick S. Collins and Mr. Joseph E. Flynn for Appellants City of Roseville, Mr. John Edward Jorgenson and Mr. Kyle Eckert in 19-2086, Mr. Patrick S. Collins and Mr. Joseph E. Flynn for Appellees City of Roseville, Mr. John Edward Jorgenson, and Mr. Kyle Eckert in 19-2172 w/service 07/18/2019. [4809612] [19-2086, 19-2172] (BNW) [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:32 PM]
July 18, 2019 Tendered Motion to File Certain Docs Under Seal and protective order received from Patrick S. Collins and Joseph E. Flynn for City of Roseville, John Edward Jorgenson, Kyle Eckert and Joseph Robert Adams in 19-2172 w/service 07/18/2019 [4809406] [19-2086, 19-2172] (MMH) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:25 PM]
June 24, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Dean Birkeland in 19-2172, Appellee Mr. Dean Birkeland in 19-2086 - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/24/2019 [4800923] [19-2172, 19-2086] (JRB) [Entered: 06/24/2019 01:38 PM]
June 24, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellees Mr. Joseph Robert Adams, City of Roseville, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. John Edward Jorgenson - Separate Appendix - w/service 06/24/2019 [4800780] [19-2172] (PSC) [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:03 AM]
June 21, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Dean Birkeland in 19-2172, Appellee Mr. Dean Birkeland in 19-2086 - w/service 06/21/2019. [4800361] [19-2172, 19-2086] (JRB) [Entered: 06/21/2019 11:26 AM]
June 13, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Joseph E. Flynn for Appellees Mr. Joseph Robert Adams, City of Roseville, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. John Edward Jorgenson w/service 06/13/2019 [4797304] [19-2172] (JEF) [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:25 AM]
June 13, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Patrick S. Collins for Appellees Mr. Joseph Robert Adams, City of Roseville, Mr. Kyle Eckert and Mr. John Edward Jorgenson w/service 06/13/2019 [4797251] [19-2172] (PSC) [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:40 AM]
June 11, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Karin Ciano for Appellant Mr. Dean Birkeland w/service 06/11/2019 [4796082] [19-2172] (KC) [Entered: 06/11/2019 07:05 AM]
June 10, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by James Behrenbrinker for Appellant Mr. Dean Birkeland w/service 06/10/2019 [4795941] [19-2172] (JRB) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:29 PM]
June 10, 2019 CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 07/22/2019. Appendix due 07/30/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, City of Roseville, Kyle Eckert and John Edward Jorgenson due 07/30/2019. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4795676] [19-2086, 19-2172] (CBO) [Entered: 06/10/2019 09:25 AM]
June 10, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of cross-appeal filed 6/3/2019, docket entries, and memorandum opinion and order filed 5/1/2019. [4795668] [19-2172] (CBO) [Entered: 06/10/2019 09:15 AM]
June 10, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4795661] [19-2172] (CBO) [Entered: 06/10/2019 09:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean Birkeland v. John Jorgenson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dean Birkeland, as trustee for the next of kin of John O. Birkeland
Represented By: Karin Ciano
Represented By: James Raymond Behrenbrinker I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Roseville
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Vicki A. Hruby
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kyle Eckert, individually and acting in their official capacities as City of Roseville Police Officers
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Vicki A. Hruby
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph Robert Adams, individually and acting in their official capacities as City of Roseville Police Officers
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Vicki A. Hruby
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Edward Jorgenson, individually and acting in their official capacities as City of Roseville Police Officers
Represented By: Patrick S. Collins
Represented By: Vicki A. Hruby
Represented By: Joseph E. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?