Peggy Jones v. Larry Jegley, et al
Defendant / Appellant: Tony Juneau, In His Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission, Lori Klein, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission, Alice L. Eastwood, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission, Larry Jegley, Prosecuting Attorney for Pulaski County, In His Official Capacity, Ashley Driver Younger, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission and Sybal Jordan Hampton, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission
Plaintiff / Appellee: Peggy Jones
Case Number: 19-2260
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4813534-2 ] filed by Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger. 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4817295] [19-2260] (MDS) [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:38 PM]
July 31, 2019 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: 3 copies. [4814098] [19-2260] (MDS) [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:21 AM]
July 30, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger , w/service 07/30/2019 [4813541] [19-2260] (MDS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:27 AM]
July 30, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger. w/service 07/30/2019, Length: 5596 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Peggy Jones, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger due 08/05/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Peggy Jones due on 08/29/2019 [4813534] [19-2260] (MDS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:25 AM]
July 29, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4813295] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:07 PM]
July 29, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4813294] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:05 PM]
July 29, 2019 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / EALR, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 06/12/2019, No. of Pgs.: 38, Court Reporter: Jacimore, Christa [4813125] [19-2260] (STL) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:36 PM]
July 15, 2019 CLERK LETTER sent regarding the matter of the filing fee. [4807941] [19-2260] (EDG) [Entered: 07/15/2019 10:48 AM]
July 15, 2019 RESPONSE in support of clerk order for failure to pay docket fee [ # 4803506-2 ], clerk order [ # 4803506-3 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel L. McFadden for Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger , w/service 07/15/2019. [4807867] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 09:54 AM]
July 10, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion to expedite the appeal, the current briefing schedule shall remain in place, and the motion to expedite is denied. Appellant's brief is due July 29, 2019. The current briefing schedule will be enforced, and no extensions will be granted. The case will be set for oral argument during the week of September 23 - 27, 2019, in St. Louis, Missouri. You will receive a calendar approximately 4 weeks before the scheduled argument date. [ # 4800955-2 ] Adp July 2019 [4806701] [19-2260] (MDS) [Entered: 07/10/2019 01:53 PM]
July 8, 2019 CLERK ORDER: The judgment of July 8, 2019 is vacated, and the mandate is hereby recalled. [4805683] [19-2260] --[Edited 07/08/2019 by MDS - Reason: This entry has been locked. Filed in incorrect case.] (MDS) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:32 PM]
July 5, 2019 REPLY to motion for an expedited appeal [ # 4800955-2 ] filed by Appellee Ms. Peggy Jones w/service 07/05/2019. [4805247] [19-2260] (CWP) [Entered: 07/05/2019 07:47 PM]
July 5, 2019 RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 4800955-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel L. McFadden for Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger , w/service 07/05/2019. [4805171] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/05/2019 01:54 PM]
July 3, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger - Joint Appendix - w/service 07/03/2019 [4804844] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:21 PM]
July 3, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger. w/service 07/03/2019 [4804825] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:08 PM]
July 3, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger - w/service 07/03/2019. [4804814] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:01 PM]
July 3, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger. Transcript ordered[4804812] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:00 PM]
July 3, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Daniel L. McFadden for Appellants Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Mr. Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger w/service 07/03/2019 [4804801] [19-2260] (DLM) [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:49 PM]
July 2, 2019 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-2260: paid - cs] [4803864] [19-2260] (AEV) [Entered: 07/02/2019 06:40 AM]
July 1, 2019 CLERK ORDER:APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger due 07/15/2019 [4803506] [19-2260] (AEV) [Entered: 07/01/2019 10:14 AM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION for an expedited appeal, filed by Appellee Ms. Peggy Jones w/service 06/24/2019. [4800955] [19-2260] (CWP) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:14 PM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by John E. Tull III for Appellee Ms. Peggy Jones w/service 06/19/2019 [4799434] [19-2260] (JET) [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:55 AM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Chad W. Pekron for Appellee Ms. Peggy Jones w/service 06/19/2019 [4799418] [19-2260] (CWP) [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:35 AM]
June 19, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 07/29/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Alice L. Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein and Ashley Driver Younger due 07/29/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4799357] [19-2260] (AEV) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:33 AM]
June 19, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 6/17/19, docket entries, [4799348] [19-2260] (AEV) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:31 AM]
June 19, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4799338] [19-2260] (AEV) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peggy Jones v. Larry Jegley, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Tony Juneau, In His Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission
Represented By: William C. Bird III
Represented By: Daniel Ladd McFadden
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Lori Klein, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission
Represented By: William C. Bird III
Represented By: Daniel Ladd McFadden
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Alice L. Eastwood, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission
Represented By: William C. Bird III
Represented By: Daniel Ladd McFadden
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Larry Jegley, Prosecuting Attorney for Pulaski County, In His Official Capacity
Represented By: William C. Bird III
Represented By: Daniel Ladd McFadden
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Ashley Driver Younger, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission
Represented By: William C. Bird III
Represented By: Daniel Ladd McFadden
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sybal Jordan Hampton, In Her Official Capacity as a Member of the Arkansas Ethics Commission
Represented By: William C. Bird III
Represented By: Daniel Ladd McFadden
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peggy Jones
Represented By: John E. Tull III
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Brittany S. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?