Ash-har Quraishi, et al v. Deputy Michael Anderson
Defendant: St. Charles County, Missouri
Plaintiff / Appellee: Quraishi Ash-har, Marla Cichowski, Sam Winslade and Ash-har Quraishi
Defendant / Appellant: Deputy Michael Anderson, a member of the St. Charles County Regional SWAT team
Case Number: 19-2462
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 3 volumes, Location STL, Comments: 3 sets. [4825058] [19-2462] (MDS) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:57 PM]
August 27, 2019 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4822412-2 ] filed by Michael Anderson 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4825042] [19-2462] (MDS) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:39 PM]
August 22, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Michael Anderson, w/service 08/22/2019 [4822413] [19-2462] (MDS) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:22 PM]
August 22, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Michael Anderson. w/service 08/22/2019, Length: 7417 words. Brief of Marla Cichowski, Ash-har Quraishi and Sam Winslade due on 09/23/2019. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Michael Anderson due 08/27/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. [4822412] [19-2462] (MDS) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:19 PM]
August 21, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Michael Anderson. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4821939] [19-2462] (HEM) [Entered: 08/21/2019 06:08 PM]
August 21, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Michael Anderson submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4821938] [19-2462] (HEM) [Entered: 08/21/2019 06:06 PM]
July 26, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Michael Anderson. No Transcript[4812769] [19-2462] (HEM) [Entered: 07/26/2019 05:00 PM]
July 26, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Michael Anderson - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/26/2019 [4812768] [19-2462] (HEM) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:59 PM]
July 26, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Michael Anderson - w/service 07/26/2019. [4812766] [19-2462] (HEM) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:58 PM]
July 24, 2019 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. [4811349] [19-2462] (TMF) [Entered: 07/24/2019 09:17 AM]
July 19, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Bernard J. Rhodes for Appellees Mr. Quraishi Ash-har, Marla Cichowski and Mr. Sam Winslade w/service 07/19/2019 [4809635] [19-2462] (BJR) [Entered: 07/19/2019 06:17 AM]
July 17, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Holly Magdziarz for Appellant Michael Anderson w/service 07/17/2019 [4808992] [19-2462] (HEM) [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:13 PM]
July 12, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/21/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Michael Anderson due 08/21/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4807632] [19-2462] (TMF) [Entered: 07/12/2019 02:13 PM]
July 12, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/10/19, docket entries, Memorandum & Order, Partial Judgment 6/10/19. [4807627] [19-2462] (TMF) [Entered: 07/12/2019 02:09 PM]
July 12, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4807620] [19-2462] (TMF) [Entered: 07/12/2019 02:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ash-har Quraishi, et al v. Deputy Michael Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Quraishi Ash-har
Represented By: Bernard J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Marla Cichowski
Represented By: Bernard J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sam Winslade
Represented By: Bernard J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ash-har Quraishi
Represented By: Bernard J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County, Missouri
Represented By: John R. Watson
Represented By: Beverly E. Temple
Represented By: Rory Patrick O'Sullivan
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Magdziarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Deputy Michael Anderson, a member of the St. Charles County Regional SWAT team
Represented By: Beverly E. Temple
Represented By: Rory Patrick O'Sullivan
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Magdziarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?