Rex Gard v. Brent Fluke, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: Rex Gard
Respondent / Appellee: Attorney General Jason Ravnsborg and Warden Brent Fluke, Mike Durfee State Prison
Case Number: 19-2486
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Appellant Mr. Rex Gard w/service 09/09/2019. [4828214] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:23 PM]
August 27, 2019 DOCUMENT FILED - Petitioner's letter requesting status of appeal. Filed by Mr. Rex Gard. w/service 08/27/2019 [4823866] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:04 PM]
August 23, 2019 Tendered Letter Regarding Status of Case received from Appellant Mr. Rex Gard. [4822622] [19-2486] (BNW) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:14 PM]
August 15, 2019 DOCUMENT FILED - Petitioner's Affidavit filed by Mr. Rex Gard. w/service 08/15/2019 [4819441] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 08/15/2019 08:09 AM]
August 14, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of second notice of appeal, docket entries, report and recommendation filed 3/29/2019, order filed 7/9/2019, and judgment filed 7/9/2019. [4819073] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 08/14/2019 11:38 AM]
August 13, 2019 Tendered Affidavit of Rex Gard received from Appellant Mr. Rex Gard [4818748] [19-2486] (CMH) [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:29 PM]
August 6, 2019 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 09/03/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4816387] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:45 PM]
August 6, 2019 CLERK LETTER sent regarding fee. District court denied IFP. Appellant must pay the docket fee to the District court or move for IFP in this court. [4816312] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:37 PM]
July 17, 2019 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4808867] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:11 AM]
July 17, 2019 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/07/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4808864] [19-2486] [4808864] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:06 AM]
July 17, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 7/15/2019, docket entries, report and recommendation filed 3/29/2019, order adopting r&r filed 7/9/2019, and judgment filed 7/9/2019. [4808862] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:04 AM]
July 17, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4808836] [19-2486] (CBO) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rex Gard v. Brent Fluke, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Rex Gard
Represented By: Rex Gard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Attorney General Jason Ravnsborg
Represented By: Quincy Ray Kjerstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Warden Brent Fluke, Mike Durfee State Prison
Represented By: Quincy Ray Kjerstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?