Little Rock Fam. Planning Svcs, et al v. Leslie Rutledge, et al
Defendant / Appellant: William L. Rutledge, M.D., in his offical capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Timothy C. Paden, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Robert Breving, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Matt Durrett, in his official capcity as Prosecuting Attorney of Washington County, Don R. Phillips, M.D., in his offical capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Nathan Smith, M.D., M.P.H., in his official capacity as Director and State Health Officer of the Arkansas Department of Health, Larry Jegley, in his official capacity as Prosecuting Attorney of Pulaski County, Rhys L. Branman, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Marie Holder, in her official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Rodney Griffin, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Omar Atiq, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Leslie Rutledge, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Arkansas, Brian T. Hyatt, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, David L. Staggs, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, John H. Scribner, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board, Sylvia D. Simon, M.D., in her official capacity as Chairman of Arkansas State Medical Board, Larry D. Lovell, "Buddy" in his offical capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board and Veryl D. Hodges, D.O., in his official capacity as member of the Arkanas State Medical Board
Plaintiff / Appellee: Tom Tvedten, M.D., on behalf of himself and his patients, Stephanie Ho, MD, M.D. on behalf of herself and her patients, Little Rock Family Planning Services and Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, doing business as Planned Parenthood Great Plains
Case Number: 19-2690
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / EALR, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 07/29/2019, No. of Pgs.: 17, Court Reporter: Kruse, Margie Mary [4832779] [19-2690] (STL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:13 AM]
September 19, 2019 RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Telephone Conference [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / EALR, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 07/19/2019, No. of Pgs.: 25, Court Reporter: Hinson, Elaine M [4832776] [19-2690] (STL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:11 AM]
September 19, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order / Preliminary Injunction [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / EALR, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 07/22/2019, No. of Pgs.: 298, Court Reporter: Hinson, Elaine M [4832774] [19-2690] (STL) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:08 AM]
September 16, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4830431-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Vincent M. Wagner. Brief of Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, John H. Scribner, Sylvia D. Simon, Nathan Smith and David L. Staggs due 10/21/2019. Appendix due on 10/21/2019. [4830847] [19-2690] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/16/2019 09:16 AM]
September 13, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/21/2019, for extension of time to file Appellant's brief and appendix until 10/21/2019[4830431], filed by Attorney Mr. Vincent M. Wagner for Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs w/service 09/13/2019. [4830431] [19-2690] (VMW) [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:59 AM]
September 11, 2019 JUDGE ORDER: The motion for partial dismissal of the consolidation order [ # 4822668-2 ], and motion to exclude a portion of the documents the State has attempted to designate as part of the record on appeal [ # 4825517-2 ] are ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which the case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL Adp Sep 2019 [4829432] [19-2690] (BNW) [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:16 PM]
September 10, 2019 REPLY to response [ # 4826375-2 ], motion [ # 4822668-2 ] filed by Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten w/service 09/10/2019. [4828853] [19-2690] - FOR CAL--[Edited 09/11/2019 by BNW] (LG) [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:57 PM]
September 9, 2019 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief [ # 4825517-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs , w/service 09/09/2019. [4828437] [19-2690]- FOR CAL --[Edited 09/11/2019 by BNW] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:34 PM]
September 3, 2019 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief [ # 4822668-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs , w/service 09/03/2019. [4826375] [19-2690] - FOR CAL --[Edited 09/11/2019 by BNW] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:33 PM]
September 3, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs w/service 09/03/2019 [4826361] [19-2690] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/03/2019 05:21 PM]
September 3, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Vincent M. Wagner for Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs w/service 09/03/2019 [4826360] [19-2690] (VMW) [Entered: 09/03/2019 05:18 PM]
September 3, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Nicholas J. Bronni for Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs w/service 09/03/2019 [4826359] [19-2690] (NJB) [Entered: 09/03/2019 05:16 PM]
August 30, 2019 MOTION Exclude a portion of the documents the State has attempted to designate as part of the record on appeal., filed by Attorney Ms. Leah Godesky for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/30/2019. [4825517] [19-2690]- FOR CAL --[Edited 09/11/2019 by BNW] (LG) [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:03 PM]
August 23, 2019 MOTION for partial dismissal of the consolidation order, filed by Ms. Leah Godesky for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten, Ms. Kelly M. Scavone for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten, Ms. Kendall Turner for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten, Ms. Taylor Simeone for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten, Ms. Meagan M. Burrows for Appellees Little Rock Family Planning Services and Tom Tvedten, Ms. Susan Talcott Camp for Appellees Little Rock Family Planning Services and Tom Tvedten, Ms. Maithreyi Ratakonda for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD and Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Ms. Bettina E. Brownstein for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten and Ms. Rebecca Rhodes Jackson for Appellees Little Rock Family Planning Services and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/23/2019. [4822668] [19-2690] - FOR CAL --[Edited 09/11/2019 by BNW] (LG) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:13 PM]
August 21, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs. w/service 08/21/2019 [4821913] [19-2690] (MAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:37 PM]
August 21, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs. Transcript ordered[4821911] [19-2690] (MAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:35 PM]
August 21, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs - w/service 08/21/2019. [4821909] [19-2690] (MAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:32 PM]
August 21, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs - Joint Appendix - w/service 08/21/2019 [4821905] [19-2690] (MAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:30 PM]
August 21, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Michael A. Cantrell for Appellants Mr. Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Mr. Robert Breving, Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Ms. Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Mr. Larry Jegley, Mr. Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, Mr. John H. Scribner, Ms. Sylvia D. Simon, Mr. Nathan Smith and Mr. David L. Staggs w/service 08/21/2019 [4821901] [19-2690] (MAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:27 PM]
August 16, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Susan Talcott Camp for Appellees Little Rock Family Planning Services and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/16/2019 [4819943] [19-2690] (STC) [Entered: 08/16/2019 09:35 AM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Meagan Burrows for Appellees Little Rock Family Planning Services and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/15/2019 [4819784] [19-2690] (MMB) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:13 PM]
August 15, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma. - FOR CAL [4819778] [19-2690] (MR) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:07 PM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Maithreyi Ratakonda for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD and Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma w/service 08/15/2019 [4819775] [19-2690] (MR) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:05 PM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Taylor S. Simeone for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/15/2019 [4819683] [19-2690] (TS) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:17 PM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Kelly M. Scavone for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/15/2019 [4819681] [19-2690] (KMS) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:14 PM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Kendall Turner for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/15/2019 [4819678] [19-2690] (KT) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:12 PM]
August 15, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Little Rock Family Planning Services. - FOR CAL [4819676] [19-2690] (LG) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:09 PM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Leah Godesky for Appellees Stephanie Ho, MD, Little Rock Family Planning Services, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Tom Tvedten w/service 08/15/2019 [4819672] [19-2690] (LG) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:05 PM]
August 15, 2019 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-2690: paid - cs] paid to District Court 8/14/19. [4819434] [19-2690]--[Edited 08/15/2019 by TMF] (TMF) [Entered: 08/15/2019 07:55 AM]
August 9, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/18/2019. Appendix due 09/30/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Omar Atiq, Rhys L. Branman, Robert Breving Jr., Matt Durrett, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D. Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T. Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D. Lovell, Timothy C. Paden, Don R. Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L. Rutledge, John H. Scribner, Sylvia D. Simon, Nathan Smith and David L. Staggs due 09/30/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4817840] [19-2690] (TMF) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:48 PM]
August 9, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 8/6/19, docket entries, Order 6/27/19, Order 7/5/19, Preliminary Injunction 8/06/19. [4817837] [19-2690] (TMF) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:44 PM]
August 9, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4817833] [19-2690] (TMF) [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock Fam. Planning Svcs, et al v. Leslie Rutledge, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: William L. Rutledge, M.D., in his offical capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Timothy C. Paden, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Robert Breving, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Matt Durrett, in his official capcity as Prosecuting Attorney of Washington County
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Don R. Phillips, M.D., in his offical capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Nathan Smith, M.D., M.P.H., in his official capacity as Director and State Health Officer of the Arkansas Department of Health
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Larry Jegley, in his official capacity as Prosecuting Attorney of Pulaski County
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Rhys L. Branman, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Marie Holder, in her official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Rodney Griffin, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Omar Atiq, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Leslie Rutledge, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Arkansas
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Brian T. Hyatt, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: David L. Staggs, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John H. Scribner, M.D., in his official capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sylvia D. Simon, M.D., in her official capacity as Chairman of Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Larry D. Lovell, "Buddy" in his offical capacity as member of the Arkansas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Veryl D. Hodges, D.O., in his official capacity as member of the Arkanas State Medical Board
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Julia Carol Benafield
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tom Tvedten, M.D., on behalf of himself and his patients
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Rebecca Rhodes Jackson
Represented By: Meagan M. Burrows
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stephanie Ho, MD, M.D. on behalf of herself and her patients
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Maithreyi Ratakonda
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Little Rock Family Planning Services
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Rebecca Rhodes Jackson
Represented By: Meagan M. Burrows
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, doing business as Planned Parenthood Great Plains
Represented By: Kelly M. Scavone
Represented By: Taylor Simeone
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Maithreyi Ratakonda
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?