John Petitta v. 3M Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: John Petitta
Defendant / Appellee: 3M Company
Not Classified By Court: In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 19-2932
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: District Court document #1980 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 06/12/2019, No. of Pgs.: 161, Court Reporter: Weinbeck, Maria Victoria [4833145] [19-2899, 19-2932] (STL) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:07 AM]
September 20, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: District Court document #1536 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 09/06/2018, No. of Pgs.: 61, Court Reporter: Weinbeck, Maria Victoria [4833142] [19-2899, 19-2932] (STL) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:05 AM]
September 20, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 3 volumes, Location STL, Comments: District Court documents #999, #1000, and #1001 [Copies do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/24/2017 - 10/26/2017, Court Reporter: Weinbeck, Maria Victoria [4833139] [19-2899, 19-2932] (STL) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:02 AM]
September 20, 2019 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: District Court document #513 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/18/2017, No. of Pgs.: 110, Court Reporter: Willette, Timothy James [4833136] [19-2899, 19-2932] (STL) [Entered: 09/20/2019 07:58 AM]
September 19, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. John Petitta - Separate Appendix - w/service 09/19/2019 [4833105] [19-2932] (KSB) [Entered: 09/19/2019 04:52 PM]
September 19, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. John Petitta. Transcript ordered and part of trial court record [4833103] [19-2932] (KSB) [Entered: 09/19/2019 04:50 PM]
September 12, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Katherine S. Barrett Wiik for Appellant Mr. John Petitta w/service 09/12/2019 [4830172] [19-2932] (KSB) [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:45 PM]
September 9, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellee 3M Company w/service 09/09/2019 [4828272] [19-2932] (BWH) [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:00 PM]
September 9, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffrey P Justman for Appellee 3M Company w/service 09/09/2019 [4828171] [19-2932] (JJ) [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:35 AM]
September 9, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Aaron Van Oort for Appellee 3M Company w/service 09/09/2019 [4828169] [19-2932] (JJ) [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:34 AM]
September 9, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order dated 8/7/2019 [4828147] [19-2932] (CYZ) [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:06 AM]
September 9, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4828134] [19-2932] (CYZ) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Petitta v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Petitta
Represented By: Michael A. Sacchet
Represented By: Gabriel Assaad
Represented By: Michael Vincent Ciresi
Represented By: Ben W. Gordon Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Susan Barrett Wiik
Represented By: Kyle W. Farrar
Represented By: Wilbur W. Fluegel
Represented By: Genevieve M. Zimmerman
Represented By: J. Michael Papantonio
Represented By: Jan Marie Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 3M Company
Represented By: Benjamin Winters Hulse
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Van Oort
Represented By: Jerry Blackwell
Represented By: Jeffrey Justman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?