Central Valley Ag Cooperative, et al v. Daniel Leonard, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan and Central Valley Ag Cooperative, for itself and as Fiduciary of the Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan
Defendant / Appellee: GMS Benefits, Inc., Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc., Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc., The Benefit Group, Inc., Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C., Daniel K. Leonard and Susan Leonard
Case Number: 19-3044
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED (REDACTED) by Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan , w/service 11/12/2019 [4852443] [19-3044] (JPP) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:57 PM]
November 14, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan. w/service 11/12/2019 , Length: 12,929 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C. due 11/19/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc., Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C., GMS Benefits, Inc., Daniel K. Leonard, Susan Leonard and The Benefit Group, Inc. due on 12/16/2019 [4852441] [19-3044] (JPP) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:52 PM]
November 14, 2019 CLERK ORDER:[ # 4851729-2 ] [ # 4851729-3 ] Appellants' motion to seal the addendum is granted. Disc for sealed addendum due 11/19/2019. [4852367] [19-3044] (JPP) [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:32 PM]
November 14, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Rene E. Thorne for Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan correcting [ # 4851729-2 ] motion filed by Attorney. [4852241] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:24 PM]
November 14, 2019 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under [Rule 27/Rule 5/Rule 21/Rule 35/Rule 40], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for miscellaneous relief, [ # 4851729-2 ], submitted by Ms. Rene E. Thorne in 19-3044 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. PLEASE DO NOT REFILE YOUR MOTION. [19-3044] (JPP) [Entered: 11/14/2019 09:54 AM]
November 13, 2019 MOTION To File Portion of Addendum Under Seal, filed by Attorney Ms. Rene E. Thorne for Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan w/service 11/13/2019. [4851729] [19-3044] [4851729] [19-3044]--[Edited 11/14/2019 by JPP] (RET) [Entered: 11/13/2019 01:09 PM]
November 13, 2019 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4851605-2 ] motion to seal filed by Ms. Rene E. Thorne. The Court is hereby sealing the following: portion of appellant's appendix. [4851607] [19-3044] (JPP) [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:37 AM]
November 12, 2019 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4851410] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 11/12/2019 06:17 PM]
November 12, 2019 APPELLANT brief of Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4851408] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 11/12/2019 05:25 PM]
November 11, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Michaelle Baumert for Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan w/service 11/11/2019 [4850884] [19-3044] (MLB) [Entered: 11/11/2019 11:29 AM]
November 8, 2019 MOTION to seal portion of appendix, filed by Attorney Ms. Rene E. Thorne for Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan w/service 11/07/2019. [4851605] [19-3044] (JPP) [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:36 AM]
October 28, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Robert W. Rachal for Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan w/service 10/28/2019 [4846342] [19-3044] (RWR) [Entered: 10/28/2019 02:05 PM]
October 16, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc.. w/service 10/16/2019 [4842313] [19-3044] (TJT) [Entered: 10/16/2019 01:15 PM]
October 16, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C.. w/service 10/16/2019 [4842246] [19-3044] (MPM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:40 AM]
October 7, 2019 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan. w/service 10/07/2019 [4838846] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:12 PM]
October 3, 2019 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan - w/service 10/03/2019. [4837808] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 10/03/2019 02:47 PM]
September 27, 2019 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan - Separate Appendix - w/service 09/27/2019 [4835464] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:23 AM]
September 27, 2019 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan. No Transcript[4835462] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 09/27/2019 11:19 AM]
September 26, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C.. - FOR CAL [4835211] [19-3044] (MPM) [Entered: 09/26/2019 03:10 PM]
September 25, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Timothy J. Thalken for Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc. w/service 09/25/2019 [4834505] [19-3044] (TJT) [Entered: 09/25/2019 10:43 AM]
September 25, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by James L Schneider for Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard w/service 09/25/2019 [4834490] [19-3044] (RSS) [Entered: 09/25/2019 09:48 AM]
September 25, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Robert S. Sherrets for Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard w/service 09/25/2019 [4834487] [19-3044] (RSS) [Entered: 09/25/2019 09:45 AM]
September 24, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan. - FOR CAL [4834337] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:13 PM]
September 24, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Rene' E. Thorne for Appellants Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan w/service 09/24/2019 [4834335] [19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:12 PM]
September 24, 2019 THIS PREVIOUSLY FILED TRANSACTION - Appearance , Doc. No. [4833920-2] filed by Appellee in 19-3044 - HAS BEEN MODIFIED. MODIFICATION MADE: Revised appearance of counsel has been filed to remove Linus Humpal as he is not currently a party to this appeal. Document Modification:Document is a duplicate entry. [4834130] [19-3044] (NDW) [Entered: 09/24/2019 11:30 AM]
September 24, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Timothy J. Thalken for Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc. w/service 09/24/2019 [4834022] [19-3044] (TJT) [Entered: 09/24/2019 08:55 AM]
September 24, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Diana J Vogt for Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard w/service 09/24/2019 [4834013] [19-3044] (DJV) [Entered: 09/24/2019 08:42 AM]
September 23, 2019 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4833923] [19-3044] (TJT) [Entered: 09/23/2019 04:00 PM]
September 23, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Timothy J. Thalken for Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc. w/service 09/23/2019 [4833920] [19-3044] (TJT) [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:58 PM]
September 23, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Henry M. Perlowski for Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C. w/service 09/23/2019 [4833879] [19-3044] (HMP) [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:15 PM]
September 23, 2019 APPEARANCE filed by Megan P. Mitchell for Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C. w/service 09/23/2019 [4833872] [19-3044] (MPM) [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:11 PM]
September 23, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/04/2019. Appendix due 11/12/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan due 11/12/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4833740] [19-3044] (RLS) [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:41 AM]
September 23, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, menorandum and order dated .08/30/2019 and judgment dated 08/30/2019. [4833734] [19-3044] (RLS) [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:37 AM]
September 23, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4833705] [19-3044] (RLS) [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Central Valley Ag Cooperative, et al v. Daniel Leonard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan
Represented By: Rene E. Thorne
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Represented By: Robert W. Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Central Valley Ag Cooperative, for itself and as Fiduciary of the Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Wentz III
Represented By: Rene E. Thorne
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Represented By: Robert W. Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GMS Benefits, Inc.
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: James L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc., Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Richard Patrick Jeffries
Represented By: Megan P. Mitchell
Represented By: Henry M. Perlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Benefit Group, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Represented By: Emily R. Langdon
Represented By: Brandon J. Crainer
Represented By: Joseph Edward Jones
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Richard Patrick Jeffries
Represented By: Megan P. Mitchell
Represented By: Henry M. Perlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel K. Leonard
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: James L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Leonard
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: James L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?