Marc Lockhart v. Keith Bowers
Plaintiff / Appellant: Marc Lockhart
Defendant / Appellee: Keith Bowers, Administrator, Captain, Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 19-3242
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Marc Lockhart. w/service 11/12/2019 , Length: 8 pages Brief of Keith Bowers due on 12/18/2019 [4853206] [19-3242] (JPP) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:56 PM]
October 17, 2019 Re-mailed correspondence - case opening letter, [ # 4842227-2 ],, [ # 4842227-3 ], briefing schedule , [ # 4842248-2 ] to Mr. Marc Lockhart at Grimes Unit [19-3242]. Lockhart filed change of address a day after case opening correspondence was mailed. When mail is returned from 10/16/19, note it has already been re-sent to new location. (AEV) [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:46 AM]
October 16, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Marc Lockhart due 11/25/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4842248] [19-3242] (AEV) [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:41 AM]
October 16, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Proposed Findings and Recommendation 7/19/19, Order 8/20/19, Judgment 8/20/19, Order 01/15/19, docket entries, [4842234] [19-3242] (AEV) [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:28 AM]
October 16, 2019 Prisoner case docketed. [4842227] [19-3242] (AEV) [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marc Lockhart v. Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marc Lockhart
Represented By: Marc Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith Bowers, Administrator, Captain, Craighead County Detention Center
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?