Howard Jackson v. David Ossell, et al
Defendant / Appellee: David Ossell and Melissa Gunderson
Plaintiff / Appellant: Howard G. Jackson
Case Number: 20-1307
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 JUDGMENT FILED - This case is summarily affirmed in accordance with Eighth Circuit Rule 47A. JAMES B. LOKEN, L. STEVEN GRASZ and JONATHAN A. KOBES Adp Mar 2020 [4899832] [20-1307] (NDW) [Entered: 04/07/2020 09:37 AM]
March 31, 2020 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges James B. Loken, L. Steven Grasz, Jonathan A. Kobes in St. Louis [4899827] [20-1307] (NDW) [Entered: 04/07/2020 09:35 AM]
March 18, 2020 MOTION for Summary Affirmance of the decision below, pursuant to 8th Cir. R. App. P. 47A(b)., filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen J. Christie for Appellees Ms. Melissa Gunderson and Mr. David Ossell w/service 03/18/2020. [4892926] [20-1307]--[Edited 03/31/2020 by NDW] Edited to correct relief code. (SJC) [Entered: 03/18/2020 02:41 PM]
March 2, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Howard G. Jackson. w/service 03/03/2020 by USCA8, Length: 3 pages, 5 copies in file Brief of Melissa Gunderson and David Ossell due on 04/01/2020 [4886968] [20-1307] (NDW) [Entered: 03/03/2020 09:23 AM]
March 2, 2020 Tendered brief received from Appellant Mr. Howard G. Jackson [4886821] [20-1307] (CYZ) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:52 PM]
February 12, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Transcript due on or before 03/23/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Howard G. Jackson due 04/02/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4881182] [20-1307] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:32 PM]
February 12, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, R&R dated 3/19/2018, R&R dated 11/27/2019, order of 1/27/2020, judgment of 1/29/2020 [4881178] [20-1307] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:31 PM]
February 12, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4881168] [20-1307] (CYZ) [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Howard Jackson v. David Ossell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Ossell
Represented By: Stephen J. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Melissa Gunderson
Represented By: Stephen J. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Howard G. Jackson
Represented By: Howard G. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?