Central Valley Ag Cooperative v. Daniel Leonard, et al
Plaintiff: Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan
Defendant: Linus G. Humpal
Defendant / Appellee: GMS Benefits, Inc., Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc., Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc., The Benefit Group, Inc., Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C., Daniel K. Leonard and Susan Leonard
Plaintiff / Appellant: Central Valley Ag Cooperative, for itself and as Fiduciary of the Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan
Case Number: 20-1378
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4905886-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Rene E. Thorne. Brief of Central Valley Ag Cooperative due 05/29/2020. Appendix due on 05/29/2020 [4905944] [20-1378] (JPP) [Entered: 04/23/2020 11:07 AM]
April 23, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/29/2020, filed by Attorney Ms. Rene E. Thorne for Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative w/service 04/23/2020. [4905886] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:55 AM]
March 24, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4894843-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Rene E. Thorne. Brief of Central Valley Ag Cooperative due 05/06/2020. Appendix due on 05/06/2020 [4894958] [20-1378, 19-3044] (JPP) [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:08 PM]
March 24, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/06/2020, filed by Attorney Ms. Rene E. Thorne for Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative in 20-1378, 19-3044 w/service 03/24/2020. [4894843] [20-1378, 19-3044] (RET) [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:35 AM]
March 20, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C. in 20-1378. w/service 03/20/2020 [4893763] [20-1378, 19-3044] (MPM) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:34 AM]
March 20, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc. in 20-1378, 19-3044. w/service 03/20/2020 [4893685] [20-1378, 19-3044] (TJT) [Entered: 03/20/2020 09:23 AM]
March 19, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard in 20-1378, 19-3044. w/service 03/19/2020 [4893527] [20-1378, 19-3044] (RSS) [Entered: 03/19/2020 04:17 PM]
March 13, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Appellant Central Valleys unopposed motion to consolidate Appeals Nos. 19-3044 and 20-1378 for argument and submission is granted. [ # 4891036-2 ] [4891284] [19-3044, 20-1378] (JPP) [Entered: 03/13/2020 04:03 PM]
March 13, 2020 MOTION to consolidate cases 20-1378 and 19-3044., filed by Attorney Ms. Rene E. Thorne for Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative w/service 03/13/2020. [4891036] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 03/13/2020 10:46 AM]
March 11, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative - w/service 03/11/2020. [4890432] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 03/11/2020 07:31 PM]
March 11, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative. w/service 03/11/2020 [4890431] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 03/11/2020 07:30 PM]
March 11, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative. No Transcript[4890430] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 03/11/2020 07:28 PM]
March 11, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/11/2020 [4890429] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 03/11/2020 07:25 PM]
February 28, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative. - FOR CAL [4886419] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:52 PM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Robert W. Rachal for Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Not Party Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan w/service 02/28/2020 [4886408] [20-1378] (RWR) [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:24 PM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Rene E. Thorne for Appellant Central Valley Ag Cooperative and Not Party Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan w/service 02/28/2020 [4886407] [20-1378] (RET) [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:20 PM]
February 28, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C.. - FOR CAL [4886095] [20-1378] (MPM) [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:01 AM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Megan P. Mitchell for Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C. w/service 02/28/2020 [4886088] [20-1378] (MPM) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:53 AM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Henry M. Perlowski for Appellees Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc. and Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C. w/service 02/28/2020 [4886081] [20-1378] (HMP) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:44 AM]
February 28, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard. - FOR CAL [4886046] [20-1378] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:14 AM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by James L. Schneider for Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard w/service 02/28/2020 [4886042] [20-1378] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:13 AM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Robert S. Sherrets for Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard w/service 02/28/2020 [4886041] [20-1378] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:11 AM]
February 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Diana J. Vogt for Appellees GMS Benefits, Inc., Mr. Daniel K. Leonard and Ms. Susan Leonard w/service 02/28/2020 [4886038] [20-1378] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:10 AM]
February 27, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4885637] [20-1378] (TJT) [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:17 AM]
February 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Timothy J. Thalken for Appellee The Benefit Group, Inc. w/service 02/27/2020 [4885634] [20-1378] (TJT) [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:15 AM]
February 26, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/06/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Central Valley Ag Cooperative due 04/06/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4884974] [20-1378] (AEV) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:34 AM]
February 26, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 2/6/20, Taxation of Costs 2/14/20 (#412, 413, 414) docket entries, [4884951] [20-1378] (AEV) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:19 AM]
February 26, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4884937] [20-1378] (AEV) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Central Valley Ag Cooperative v. Daniel Leonard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GMS Benefits, Inc.
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: James L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anasazi Medical Payment Solutions, Inc., Advanced Medical Pricing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Richard Patrick Jeffries
Represented By: Megan P. Mitchell
Represented By: Henry M. Perlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Benefit Group, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Represented By: Emily R. Langdon
Represented By: Brandon J. Crainer
Represented By: Joseph Edward Jones
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Claims Delegate Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Richard Patrick Jeffries
Represented By: Megan P. Mitchell
Represented By: Henry M. Perlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel K. Leonard
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: James L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Leonard
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: James L. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linus G. Humpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Central Valley Ag Cooperative, for itself and as Fiduciary of the Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Wentz III
Represented By: Rene E. Thorne
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Represented By: Brock J. Pohlmeier
Represented By: Robert W. Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Valley Ag Cooperative Health Care Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?