Gary Webster v. Marty Boyd, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Channel 8 Television, Sun Newspaper, Jonesboro, Karen Ann Rhinehardt, Jonesboro Police Officer, Ernest Ward, Police Detective, Jonesboro, City of Jonesboro, St. Bernard's Hospital, Jonesboro, Marty Boyd, Craighead County Sheriff, Doe, Craighead County Judge, David Talley, Reporter and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Gary Leon Webster
Case Number: 20-1766
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 PETITION for rehearing by panel filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster. [4920579] [20-1766] (MDS) [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:04 AM]
May 26, 2020 MANDATE ISSUED. [4916218] [20-1766] (HAG) [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:44 AM]
May 26, 2020 JUDGMENT FILED - Denying [ # 4912372-2 ] motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster. The full $505 appellate and docketing fees are assessed against the appellant. The court remands the collection of those fees to the district court. Appellant has failed to respond to the show cause order and the time for a response has expired. This appeal is dismissed for want of prosecution. Mandate shall issue forthwith. DUANE BENTON, ROGER L. WOLLMAN and JONATHAN A. KOBES Adp May 2020 [4916215] [20-1766] (HAG) [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:40 AM]
May 22, 2020 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Duane Benton, Roger L. Wollman, Jonathan A. Kobes in St. Louis [4916213] [20-1766] (HAG) [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:38 AM]
May 11, 2020 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster w/service 05/12/2020. [4912372] [20-1766] (CMH) [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:40 AM]
May 11, 2020 RESPONSE in opposition to clerk order pay full filing fee, filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Leon Webster w/service 05/12/2020. [4912367] [20-1766]--[Edited 05/22/2020 by CMH to reflect correct event and relief] (CMH) [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:35 AM]
April 13, 2020 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4902128] [20-1766] (CMH) [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:22 PM]
April 13, 2020 CLERK ORDER:The district Court has determined that Appellant has three strikes under 28 U.S.C Section 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the district court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 05/13/2020 [4902127] [20-1766] (CMH) [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:20 PM]
April 13, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 3/30/2020, and Order dated 4/10/2020. [4902123] [20-1766] (CMH) [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:19 PM]
April 13, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4902113] [20-1766] (CMH) [Entered: 04/13/2020 04:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gary Webster v. Marty Boyd, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Channel 8 Television
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sun Newspaper, Jonesboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Karen Ann Rhinehardt, Jonesboro Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ernest Ward, Police Detective, Jonesboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Jonesboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: St. Bernard's Hospital, Jonesboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marty Boyd, Craighead County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doe, Craighead County Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Talley, Reporter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Leon Webster
Represented By: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?