Mahaska Bottling Company, et al v. Pepsico, Inc.
Defendant: Bottling Group, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina, Inc., Mahaska Bottling Company, Inc. and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk, Inc.
Defendant / Appellant: Pepsico, Inc.
Case Number: 20-1783
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4914355-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Shauna Izadi and Ms. Linda Martin. Brief of Pepsico due 07/20/2020. Appendix due on 07/20/2020. [4914473] [20-1783] (BNW) [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:17 PM]
May 18, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 07/20/2020, for extension of time to file Defendant-Appellant/Cross-Appellee PepsiCo, Inc.'s separate appendix until 07/20/2020[4914355], filed by Attorney Ms. Shauna Izadi for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina and Attorney Ms. Linda Martin for Appellant Pepsico in 20-1783 w/service 05/18/2020. [4914355] [20-1783]--[Edited to remove filing from associated case 05/18/2020 by AMT] (LM) [Entered: 05/18/2020 02:22 PM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED RECORDS, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 3, Comments: 3 copoies Sealed Documents #415 & #388, Source Location: USDC-SIA [4913272] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:37 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - TRANSCRIPT, 12 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Volumes I-XII, Source Location: USDC-SIA, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 11/04/2019, No. of Pgs.: 1933, Type of Proceeding: Jury Trial, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913267] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:30 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: Final Pretrial Conference Transcript #349 COPY - DO NOT RETURN, Source Location: USDC-SIA, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/03/2019, No. of Pgs.: 75, Type of Proceeding: Pretrial Conf, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913257] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:12 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: Sealed Motion Hearing Transcript #262, Source Location: USDC-SIA, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 05/30/2019, No. of Pgs.: 66, Type of Proceeding: Motion, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913255] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:09 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Source Location: USDC-SIA, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 07/18/2017, No. of Pgs.: 37, Type of Proceeding: Hearing, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913247] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 10:02 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: Jury Trial Transcript Volume IX (#444), Source Location: USDC-SIA, Type of Proceeding: Trial, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913226] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 09:39 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: Jury Trial Voume VII (#443), Source Location: USDC-SIA, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913225] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 09:37 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: Sealed - Doc #442 (Volume V), Source Location: USDC-SIA, Type of Proceeding: Jury Trial, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913217] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 09:30 AM]
May 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - SEALED TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, No. of Envelopes: 1, Comments: Doc #441, Source Location: USDC-SIA, Type of Proceeding: Jury Trial, Court Reporter: Martin, Terri [4913213] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMW) [Entered: 05/14/2020 09:27 AM]
May 12, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Pepsico in 20-1783. No Transcript[4912699] [20-1783, 20-1866] (LM) [Entered: 05/12/2020 06:08 PM]
May 12, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Pepsico in 20-1783 - Separate Appendix - w/service 05/12/2020 [4912698] [20-1783, 20-1866] (LM) [Entered: 05/12/2020 06:04 PM]
April 28, 2020 CLERK ORDER: : This appeal is remanded to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Iowa for the limited purpose of permitting the District Court to correct an omission in the Exhibit List as outlined in the District Court Judges letter of April 27, 2020 to the clerk of this court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a). Based on the limited nature of the remand, the briefing schedule will not be stayed [4907534] [20-1783, 20-1866] (JPP) [Entered: 04/28/2020 02:58 PM]
April 28, 2020 LETTER regarding from district court regarding omission of exhibits. [4907515] [20-1783, 20-1866] (JPP) [Entered: 04/28/2020 02:47 PM]
April 28, 2020 CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/26/2020. Appendix due 06/04/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Pepsico due 06/04/2020. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4907399] [20-1783, 20-1866] (CMH) [Entered: 04/28/2020 12:33 PM]
April 22, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Pepsico. - FOR CAL [4905777] [20-1783] (LM) [Entered: 04/22/2020 05:55 PM]
April 22, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina. - FOR CAL [4905715] [20-1783] (SI) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:45 PM]
April 21, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Johannes H. Moorlach for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/21/2020 [4905058] [20-1783] (JHM) [Entered: 04/21/2020 12:05 PM]
April 21, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Spencer S. Cady for Appellant Pepsico w/service 04/21/2020 [4904982] [20-1783] (SSC) [Entered: 04/21/2020 10:52 AM]
April 20, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Robert J. McCallum for Appellant Pepsico w/service 04/20/2020 [4904783] [20-1783] (RJM) [Entered: 04/20/2020 05:31 PM]
April 20, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Linda H. Martin for Appellant Pepsico w/service 04/20/2020 [4904782] [20-1783] (LM) [Entered: 04/20/2020 05:27 PM]
April 16, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Angela B. Kennedy for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/16/2020 [4903477] [20-1783] (ABK) [Entered: 04/16/2020 12:13 PM]
April 16, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Thomas B. Weaver for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/16/2020 [4903362] [20-1783] (TBW) [Entered: 04/16/2020 10:06 AM]
April 15, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by F. Colby Roberts for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/15/2020 [4903233] [20-1783] (SI) [Entered: 04/15/2020 05:05 PM]
April 15, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Lawrence J. Friedman for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/15/2020 [4903230] [20-1783] (SI) [Entered: 04/15/2020 05:02 PM]
April 15, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Jason H. Friedman for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/15/2020 [4903229] [20-1783] (SI) [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:58 PM]
April 15, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by James Robert Krause for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/15/2020 [4903220] [20-1783] (SI) [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:37 PM]
April 15, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Shauna Izadi for Appellees Mahaska Bottling Company, Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk and Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina w/service 04/15/2020 [4903213] [20-1783] (SI) [Entered: 04/15/2020 04:24 PM]
April 15, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/26/2020. Appendix due 06/04/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Pepsico due 06/04/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4902887] [20-1783] (CMH) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:05 AM]
April 15, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment dated 11/21/2019, Order dated 3/12/2020, Amended & Substituted Judgment dated 3/13/2020. [4902865] [20-1783] (CMH) [Entered: 04/15/2020 10:45 AM]
April 15, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4902856] [20-1783] (CMH) [Entered: 04/15/2020 10:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mahaska Bottling Company, et al v. Pepsico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Salina, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Friedman
Represented By: Johannes Moorlach
Represented By: Jason H. Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Blumeyer Weaver
Represented By: James Robert Krause
Represented By: F. Colby Roberts
Represented By: Ernest W. Leonard
Represented By: Jonathan Ryan Shulan
Represented By: Shauna Izadi
Represented By: Angela Belle Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mahaska Bottling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Friedman
Represented By: Johannes Moorlach
Represented By: Jason H. Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Blumeyer Weaver
Represented By: James Robert Krause
Represented By: F. Colby Roberts
Represented By: Ernest W. Leonard
Represented By: Jonathan Ryan Shulan
Represented By: Shauna Izadi
Represented By: Angela Belle Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pepsi-Cola Bottling Company of Norfolk, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Friedman
Represented By: Johannes Moorlach
Represented By: Jason H. Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Blumeyer Weaver
Represented By: James Robert Krause
Represented By: F. Colby Roberts
Represented By: Ernest W. Leonard
Represented By: Jonathan Ryan Shulan
Represented By: Shauna Izadi
Represented By: Angela Belle Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Pepsico, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Martin
Represented By: Brent Scott Wible
Represented By: Elena Hadjimichael
Represented By: Thomas Ensign
Represented By: Debra Lynne Hulett
Represented By: Laura Cielle Onken
Represented By: Umer Ali
Represented By: Spencer S. Cady
Represented By: Robert John McCallum
Represented By: Lauren Beverly Kaplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bottling Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?