Logan Lundahl, et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, et al
Defendant / Appellee: First American Title Insurance Company, Smith County, TX, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., Lilia Chavarin, Mel Hoffman, Old Republic Insurance Co., HSBC, Does 1-10, David Gilbertson, Paul Kelley, Jr., Craig Pfeifle, in their Administrative Capacities, American Title Insurance Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, Sandra Copeland, Los Angeles Homeowners Aid and Lois Mosley
Plaintiff / Appellant: Logan Lundahl and Holli Lundahl
Case Number: 20-2014
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 MOTION to substitute MARTI LUNDAHL for LOGAN LUNDAHL., filed by Party Mr. Logan Lundahl w/service 07/14/2020. [4933856] [20-2014] (HL) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:48 AM]
June 25, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4927403-2 ] motion for extension of time to file briefs filed by Appellants Ms. Holli Lundahl and Mr. Logan Lundahl. Briefs of Holli Lundahl and Logan Lundahl due 07/29/2020 [4927426] [20-2014] (LMT) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:33 PM]
June 25, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 07/29/2020, filed by Ms. Holli Lundahl and Mr. Logan Lundahl w/service 06/25/2020. [4927403] [20-2014] (HL) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:01 PM]
June 25, 2020 JUDGE ORDER:Denying [ # 4926099-2 ] motion for stay filed by Appellant Ms. Holli Lundahl. Special June 2020 [4927239] [20-2014] (JPP) [Entered: 06/25/2020 09:28 AM]
June 22, 2020 MOTION for stay, filed by Party Ms. Holli Lundahl w/service 06/21/2020. [4926099] [20-2014] (HL) [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:49 PM]
May 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Jeffery D. Collins for Appellee Ms. Lilia Chavarin w/service 05/26/2020 [4916749] [20-2014] (JDC) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:26 PM]
May 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Cassidy M. Stalley for Appellee Ms. Lilia Chavarin w/service 05/26/2020 [4916741] [20-2014] (CMS) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:22 PM]
May 22, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Terry G. Westergaard for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company w/service 05/22/2020 [4915944] [20-2014] (TGW) [Entered: 05/22/2020 12:39 PM]
May 22, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Heather Lammers Bogard for Appellee American Modern Insurance Group, Inc. w/service 05/22/2020 [4915808] [20-2014] (HL) [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:35 AM]
May 21, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Mark W. Haigh for Appellee Old Republic Insurance Co. w/service 05/21/2020 [4915665] [20-2014] (MWH) [Entered: 05/21/2020 04:29 PM]
May 20, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Holli Lundahl and Logan Lundahl due 06/29/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4915229] [20-2014] (CYZ) [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:03 PM]
May 20, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order of 3/9/2020, judgment of 3/9/2020, order of 4/8/2020, order of 4/8/2020, notice of appeal, order of 5/19/2020 [4915226] [20-2014] (CYZ) [Entered: 05/20/2020 02:58 PM]
May 20, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4915218] [20-2014] (CYZ) [Entered: 05/20/2020 02:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Logan Lundahl, et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Smith County, TX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Modern Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Lammers Bogard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lilia Chavarin
Represented By: Cassidy M. Stalley
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mel Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Old Republic Insurance Co.
Represented By: Tyler Haigh
Represented By: Mark William Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Kelley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Craig Pfeifle, in their Administrative Capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Title Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sandra Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Los Angeles Homeowners Aid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lois Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Logan Lundahl
Represented By: Logan Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Holli Lundahl
Represented By: Holli Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?