League of Women Voters of MO, et al v. John Ashcroft, et al
Defendant / Appellant: Joel W. Walters, in his official capacity as Director of the Missouri Department of Revenue and John R. Ashcroft, in his official capacity as Missouri Secretary of State
Plaintiff / Appellee: St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri and Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute
Case Number: 20-2440
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. - FOR CAL [4949593] [20-2440] (AER) [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:30 PM]
August 26, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee League of Women Voters of Missouri. - FOR CAL [4949591] [20-2440] (AER) [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:29 PM]
August 26, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute. - FOR CAL [4949562] [20-2440] (AER) [Entered: 08/26/2020 12:18 PM]
August 6, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4942238-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Melanie Pennycuff [4942671] Brief of John R. Ashcroft and Joel W. Walters due 09/24/2020. Appendix due on 09/24/2020 [4942671] [20-2440] (JPP) [Entered: 08/06/2020 10:16 AM]
August 5, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/09/2020, filed by Attorney Ms. Melanie Pennycuff for Appellants Mr. John R. Ashcroft and Mr. Joel W. Walters w/service 08/05/2020. [4942238] [20-2440] (MP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:08 AM]
July 29, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Mr. John R. Ashcroft and Mr. Joel W. Walters - w/service 07/29/2020. [4939313] [20-2440] (MP) [Entered: 07/29/2020 09:54 AM]
July 21, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Mr. John R. Ashcroft and Mr. Joel W. Walters. No Transcript[4936204] [20-2440] (MP) [Entered: 07/21/2020 01:31 PM]
July 21, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. John R. Ashcroft and Mr. Joel W. Walters - Joint Appendix - w/service 07/21/2020 [4935968] [20-2440] (MP) [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:11 AM]
July 16, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Melanie Pennycuff for Appellants Mr. John R. Ashcroft and Mr. Joel W. Walters w/service 07/16/2020 [4934539] [20-2440] (MP) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:35 PM]
July 16, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/25/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT John R. Ashcroft and Joel W. Walters due 08/25/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4934504] [20-2440] (CAH) [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:50 PM]
July 16, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 6/12/20, judgment 7/1/20. [4934503] [20-2440] (CAH) [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:49 PM]
July 16, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4934500] [20-2440] (CAH) [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: League of Women Voters of MO, et al v. John Ashcroft, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Joel W. Walters, in his official capacity as Director of the Missouri Department of Revenue
Represented By: Melanie Pennycuff
Represented By: Eileen Ruppe Krispin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John R. Ashcroft, in his official capacity as Missouri Secretary of State
Represented By: Melanie Pennycuff
Represented By: Eileen Ruppe Krispin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Miranda Galindo
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Sabrina Shermin Khan
Represented By: Sarah Brannon
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: League of Women Voters of Missouri
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Miranda Galindo
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Sabrina Shermin Khan
Represented By: Sarah Brannon
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Represented By: Davin M. Rosborough
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Naila S. Awan
Represented By: Miranda Galindo
Represented By: Chiraag Bains
Represented By: Sabrina Shermin Khan
Represented By: Sarah Brannon
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?