Roger Hoffert, Jr. v. Jeremy Westendorf, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Tony Thompson, Individually and in his official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Sheriff, Phillip Wendling, Individually and in his official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Sheriff's Deputy, Chastity Sullivan, Individually and in her official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Attorney, Beth Skinner, Individually and in his official capacity as Director of the Iowa Department of Corrections, Jeremy Westendorf, Individually and in his official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Attorney and Kimberly A. Griffith, Individually and in her official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Attorney
Plaintiff / Appellant: Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr.
Case Number: 20-2648
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. , w/service 10/02/2020 [4962013] [20-2648] (CRJ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:26 PM]
October 2, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr.. w/service 10/02/2020 , Length: 16 pages, 5 copies Brief of Kimberly A. Griffith, Beth Skinner, Chastity Sullivan, Tony Thompson, Phillip Wendling and Jeremy Westendorf due on 11/02/2020 [4962008] [20-2648] (CRJ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:19 PM]
September 25, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4959608-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. Brief of Roger Joseph Hoffert Jr. due 10/28/2020. [4959615] [20-2648] (HAG) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:38 PM]
September 25, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief, filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. w/service by USCA8 09/25/2020. [4959608] [20-2648] (HAG) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:33 PM]
September 17, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Appellants motion for appointment of counsel is denied; appellant must seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court. Once in forma pauperis status is granted, appellant may renew his motion for appointment of counsel. [ # 4956915-2 ] [4956916] [20-2648] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:18 PM]
September 16, 2020 MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. w/service by USCA8 09/17/2020. [4956915] [20-2648] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:15 PM]
September 3, 2020 LETTER from Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. regarding motions for appointment of cousnel. w/service 09/04/2020 [4952834] [20-2648] (MDS) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:40 PM]
September 3, 2020 DOCUMENT FILED - 2nd motion for appointment of counsel filed by Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr.. w/service 09/04/2020 [4952815] [20-2648] (Mailed 8/27/20. Crossed in the mail with order) (MDS) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:25 PM]
September 2, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Appellant has moved for appointment of counsel but appellant is not proceeding with leave to proceed in forma pauperis and thus the court is unable to appoint counsel. Accordingly, Appellants motion for appointment of counsel is denied. [ # 4951951-2 ] [4952074] [20-2648] (JPP) [Entered: 09/02/2020 04:26 PM]
September 2, 2020 MOTION for appointment of counsel, filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. w/service 08/10/2020. [4951951] [20-2648] (JPP) [Entered: 09/02/2020 02:33 PM]
August 28, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Appellants [ # 4950523-2 ] motion for an extension of time to file his opening brief is granted to September 28, 2020. Appellants motion states, in Paragraph 2, that he has filed a motion for appointment of counsel. No such motion has been filed with this court. The court notes a motion for appointment of counsel has been filed with the district court, but any motion for appointment of counsel for the purposes of the appeal must be filed with the court of appeals. [4950602] [20-2648] (HAG) [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:50 PM]
August 28, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief , filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. w/service by USCA8 08/28/2020. [4950523] [20-2648] (HAG) [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:14 PM]
August 20, 2020 CLERK ORDER: [ # 4945790-2 ] Ms. Jessica Donels, counsel for Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr., has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [4947429] [20-2648] (JPP) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:16 PM]
August 17, 2020 MOTION to withdraw as appointed counsel, filed by Attorney Ms. Jessica Donels for Appellant Mr. Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr. w/service 08/17/2020. [4945790] [20-2648] (JD) [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:00 AM]
August 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Samuel C. Anderson for Appellees Ms. Kimberly A. Griffith, Chastity Sullivan, Tony Thompson, Phillip Wendling, Mr. Jeremy Westendorf w/service 08/12/2020 [4944733] [20-2648]--[Edited 08/12/2020 by NDW] Edited to remove appellant. (SCA) [Entered: 08/12/2020 02:34 PM]
August 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by William A. Hill for Appellee Beth Skinner w/service 08/12/2020 [4944669] [20-2648] (WAH) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:40 PM]
August 6, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Roger Joseph Hoffert Jr. due 09/15/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4943010] [20-2648] (AEV) [Entered: 08/06/2020 05:40 PM]
August 6, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 7/16/20, Judgment 7/16/20, docket entries, [4942992] [20-2648] (AEV) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:47 PM]
August 6, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4942988] [20-2648] (AEV) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roger Hoffert, Jr. v. Jeremy Westendorf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tony Thompson, Individually and in his official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Sheriff
Represented By: Samuel C. Anderson
Represented By: Samuel Cief Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Phillip Wendling, Individually and in his official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Sheriff's Deputy
Represented By: Samuel C. Anderson
Represented By: Samuel Cief Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chastity Sullivan, Individually and in her official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Attorney
Represented By: Samuel C. Anderson
Represented By: Samuel Cief Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Beth Skinner, Individually and in his official capacity as Director of the Iowa Department of Corrections
Represented By: William Allen Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeremy Westendorf, Individually and in his official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Attorney
Represented By: Samuel C. Anderson
Represented By: Samuel Cief Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kimberly A. Griffith, Individually and in her official capacity as an Assistant Black Hawk County Attorney
Represented By: Samuel C. Anderson
Represented By: Samuel Cief Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Roger Joseph Hoffert, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Donels
Represented By: Roger Joseph Hoffert Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?