Michael Boyd v. Brandon Harrison, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Brandon James Harrison, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals, Kathryn Pannel, Employee, Simmons Bank, Cliff Hoofman, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals, Robert J. Gladwin, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals, Barbara Mariani, Deputy Prosecuting Attorney, Waymond Brown, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals, Rita Williamson Gruber, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals, Wade Tolett, Officer, North Little Rock Police Department, Cody Brown, Detective, North Little Rock City Police Department, Herbert T. Wright, Judge, Pulaski County Circuit Court, Raymond Abramson, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals, Phillip Whiteaker, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals and Michael Gibbons, Detective, North Little Rock Police Department
Plaintiff / Appellant: Michael Lavern Boyd
Case Number: 20-2664
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 4, 2021 Michael Boyd v. Brandon Harrison

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 4962650-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Vincent P. France. Brief of Raymond Abramson, Cody Brown, Waymond Brown, Michael Gibbons, Robert J. Gladwin, Rita Williamson Gruber, Brandon James Harrison, Cliff Hoofman, Barbara Mariani, Wade Tolett, Phillip Whiteaker and Herbert T. Wright due 11/12/2020. [4963037] [20-2664] (MDS) [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:12 PM]
October 6, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/12/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Vincent P. France for Appellees Raymond Abramson, Ms. Barbara Mariani, Mr. Cliff Hoofman, Phillip Whiteaker, Herbert T. Wright, Mr. Brandon James Harrison, Ms. Rita Williamson Gruber, Mr. Robert J. Gladwin and Mr. Waymond Brown w/service 10/06/2020. [4962650] [20-2664]--[Edited 10/06/2020 by MDS - Reason: Edited to correct requested date.] (VPF) [Entered: 10/06/2020 07:33 AM]
September 21, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Michael Lavern Boyd. w/service by USCA8 09/21/2020 , Length: 28 pages (5 Copies) Brief of Raymond Abramson, Cody Brown, Waymond Brown, Michael Gibbons, Robert J. Gladwin, Rita Williamson Gruber, Brandon James Harrison, Cliff Hoofman, Barbara Mariani, Wade Tolett, Phillip Whiteaker and Herbert T. Wright due on 10/21/2020 [4957831] [20-2664] (AMT) [Entered: 09/21/2020 01:19 PM]
September 1, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Vincent P. France for Appellees Mr. Brandon James Harrison, Ms. Rita Williamson Gruber, Raymond Abramson, Mr. Robert J. Gladwin, Phillip Whiteaker, Mr. Cliff Hoofman, Mr. Waymond Brown, Herbert T. Wright and Ms. Barbara Mariani w/service 09/01/2020 [4951489] [20-2664] (VPF) [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:14 PM]
August 18, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Amy Beckman Fields for Appellees Mr. Michael Gibbons, Mr. Cody Brown and Mr. Wade Tolett w/service 08/18/2020 [4946469] [20-2664] (AF) [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:05 PM]
August 18, 2020 DOCUMENT FILED - Request for status of appeal filed by Mr. Michael Lavern Boyd, w/service by USCA8 08/18/2020. Copy of docket sheet sent to appellant. [4946413] [20-2664] (HAG) [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:14 PM]
August 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Vincent P. France for Appellees Mr. Brandon James Harrison, Ms. Rita Williamson Gruber, Raymond Abramson, Mr. Robert J. Gladwin, Phillip Whiteaker, Mr. Cliff Hoofman and Mr. Waymond Brown w/service 08/12/2020 [4944419] [20-2664] (VPF) [Entered: 08/12/2020 07:50 AM]
August 10, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Michael Lavern Boyd due 09/21/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4943744] [20-2664] (CMH) [Entered: 08/10/2020 02:21 PM]
August 10, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 6/8/2020, and Order dated 8/7/2020. [4943740] [20-2664] (CMH) [Entered: 08/10/2020 02:17 PM]
August 10, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4943737] [20-2664] (CMH) [Entered: 08/10/2020 02:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Boyd v. Brandon Harrison, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brandon James Harrison, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathryn Pannel, Employee, Simmons Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cliff Hoofman, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert J. Gladwin, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barbara Mariani, Deputy Prosecuting Attorney
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Waymond Brown, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rita Williamson Gruber, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wade Tolett, Officer, North Little Rock Police Department
Represented By: Amy Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cody Brown, Detective, North Little Rock City Police Department
Represented By: Amy Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Herbert T. Wright, Judge, Pulaski County Circuit Court
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Raymond Abramson, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Phillip Whiteaker, Justice, Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Gibbons, Detective, North Little Rock Police Department
Represented By: Amy Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Lavern Boyd
Represented By: Michael Lavern Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?