Craig Shipp v. Kevin Murphy, et al
Defendant: Nurse Melissa Stoner, Kimberly Hoffman, Medical Administrator, Individually, Dr. Lorene Lomax, Employee/Contract Physician of SW AR Community Correction Center and Nurse Diane Cunningham
Defendant / Appellee: John and Jane Doe Physicians, All unknown physicians and medical staff of SWACCC in Texarkana, John and Jane Doe Employees, All unknown employees of the SWACCC in Texarkana, Correct Care Solutions LLC, Steve Arnold, Warden, SW AR Community Correction, Individually, Kendall Smith, Nurse, Individually, Lenora Turner, Medical Director, SW AR Community Correction Center, Individually, Dr. Mimo Lemdja, Employee/Contract Physical SW AR Community Correction Center, Individually and Kevin Murphy, Chief Deputy, Director, Individually
Plaintiff / Appellant: Craig Shipp
Case Number: 20-2703
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 CORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Court Record, Doc No. [ # 4960303-2 ], filed by Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp [4960516] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 09/29/2020 09:21 AM]
September 29, 2020 CORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for brief, Doc No. [ # 4958759-2 ], filed by Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp [4960515] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 09/29/2020 09:19 AM]
September 28, 2020 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4958759-2 ] filed by Mr. Craig Shipp 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached Paper brief deficiency due 10/05/2020. [4960320] [20-2703] (NDW) [Entered: 09/28/2020 03:10 PM]
September 28, 2020 RECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 5 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 5 volumes each. All volumes in one box. Record Deficiency due on 10/05/2020. [4960303] [20-2703]--[Edited 09/28/2020 by NDW] Edited to reflect boxed copies. (NDW) [Entered: 09/28/2020 02:51 PM]
September 23, 2020 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp , w/service 09/23/2020 [4958760] [20-2703] (NDW) [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:14 PM]
September 23, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Craig Shipp. w/service 09/23/2020 , Length: 6,882 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Craig Shipp due 09/28/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Steve Arnold, Correct Care Solutions LLC, John and Jane Doe Employees, John and Jane Doe Physicians, Mimo Lemdja, Kevin Murphy, Kendall Smith and Lenora Turner due on 10/23/2020 [4958759] [20-2703] (NDW) [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:12 PM]
September 23, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Craig Shipp. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4958739] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:54 PM]
September 23, 2020 Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Mr. Derek Stuart Franseen for Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp, Mr. Ronald W. Metcalf for Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp and Mr. Michael Allen Walsh for Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp. New electronic copy of addendum due on 09/28/2020 [4958725] [20-2703] (NDW) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:37 PM]
September 23, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Craig Shipp. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4958707] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:21 PM]
September 23, 2020 APPELLANT brief of Mr. Craig Shipp submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4958702] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:19 PM]
August 28, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp - w/service 08/28/2020. [4950536] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:26 PM]
August 28, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp - Joint Appendix - w/service 08/28/2020 [4950532] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:24 PM]
August 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Ronald W. Metcalf for Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp w/service 08/26/2020 [4949719] [20-2703] (RWM) [Entered: 08/26/2020 03:36 PM]
August 25, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Correct Care Solutions LLC. - FOR CAL [4949288] [20-2703] (MBO) [Entered: 08/25/2020 04:17 PM]
August 20, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Michael Allen Walsh for Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp w/service 08/20/2020 [4947248] [20-2703] (MAW) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:42 AM]
August 20, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Derek Stuart Franseen for Appellant Mr. Craig Shipp w/service 08/20/2020 [4947246] [20-2703] (DSF) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:40 AM]
August 17, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Rosalyn Middleton for Appellees Steve Arnold and Kevin Murphy w/service 08/17/2020 [4945830] [20-2703] (RLM) [Entered: 08/17/2020 11:27 AM]
August 14, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Michelle Banks Odum for Appellees Correct Care Solutions LLC, Mimo Lemdja, Ms. Lenora Turner and Kendall Smith w/service 08/14/2020 [4945635] [20-2703] (MBO) [Entered: 08/14/2020 03:59 PM]
August 14, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/23/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Craig Shipp due 09/23/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4945537] [20-2703] (CAH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 02:04 PM]
August 14, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 10/22/19, memorandum & opinion 7/15/20, memorandum & opinion 7/15/20, judgment 7/15/20. [4945536] [20-2703] (CAH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 02:03 PM]
August 14, 2020 Prisoner case docketed. [4945530] [20-2703]--[Edited 08/20/2020 by CAH to change from civil case to prisoner case] (CAH) [Entered: 08/14/2020 01:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Craig Shipp v. Kevin Murphy, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John and Jane Doe Physicians, All unknown physicians and medical staff of SWACCC in Texarkana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John and Jane Doe Employees, All unknown employees of the SWACCC in Texarkana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Correct Care Solutions LLC
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steve Arnold, Warden, SW AR Community Correction, Individually
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kendall Smith, Nurse, Individually
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lenora Turner, Medical Director, SW AR Community Correction Center, Individually
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Mimo Lemdja, Employee/Contract Physical SW AR Community Correction Center, Individually
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin Murphy, Chief Deputy, Director, Individually
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Melissa Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Hoffman, Medical Administrator, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lorene Lomax, Employee/Contract Physician of SW AR Community Correction Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Diane Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Craig Shipp
Represented By: Michael Allen Walsh
Represented By: Ronald W. Metcalf
Represented By: Derek Stuart Franseen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?