Randy Kinder Excavating v. JA Manning Construction Compan
Plaintiff: Tricon Precast, Ltd.
Defendant: Granite Re, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: JA Manning Construction Company, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Randy Kinder Excavating, Inc.
Case Number: 20-2747
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Randy Kinder Excavating , w/service 10/14/2020 [4965192] [20-2747] (NDW) [Entered: 10/14/2020 09:28 AM]
October 14, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Randy Kinder Excavating. w/service 10/14/2020 , Length: 18 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Randy Kinder Excavating due 10/19/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of JA Manning Construction Company due on 11/13/2020 [4965191] [20-2747] DOCUMENT REPLACED TO CORRECT COVER PAGE. NDA RESENT.--[Edited 10/14/2020 by AMT] (NDW) [Entered: 10/14/2020 09:27 AM]
October 13, 2020 APPELLANT brief of Randy Kinder Excavating submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4965035] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:14 PM]
October 9, 2020 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Matthew Wayne Willis for Appellant Randy Kinder Excavating. [4964444] [20-2747] (NDW) [Entered: 10/09/2020 02:37 PM]
October 9, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Randy Kinder Excavating. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4964379] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 10/09/2020 01:28 PM]
October 9, 2020 APPELLANT brief of Randy Kinder Excavating submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4964377] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 10/09/2020 01:27 PM]
September 8, 2020 CERTIFICATE of Transcript: No Transcript -- w/service 09/08/2020 [4953372] [20-2747]--[Edited to correct dkt txt 10/08/2020 by HAG] (MWW) [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:54 PM]
September 2, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Randy Kinder Excavating. w/service 09/02/2020 [4952020] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:37 PM]
September 2, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Randy Kinder Excavating - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/02/2020 [4952010] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:32 PM]
September 2, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Randy Kinder Excavating - w/service 09/02/2020. [4951913] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 09/02/2020 01:37 PM]
August 27, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee JA Manning Construction Company. - FOR CAL [4949974] [20-2747] (EBG) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:41 AM]
August 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Robert L. Magrini for Appellee JA Manning Construction Company w/service 08/27/2020 [4949973] [20-2747] (RLM) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:40 AM]
August 27, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Evan B. Gatewood for Appellee JA Manning Construction Company w/service 08/20/2020 [4949971] [20-2747] (EBG) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:39 AM]
August 26, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Randy Kinder Excavating. - FOR CAL [4949614] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:55 PM]
August 26, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Matthew W. Willis for Appellant Randy Kinder Excavating w/service 08/26/2020 [4949367] [20-2747] (MWW) [Entered: 08/26/2020 08:39 AM]
August 20, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/29/2020. Appendix due 10/09/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Randy Kinder Excavating due 10/09/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4947335] [20-2747] (CAH) [Entered: 08/20/2020 02:03 PM]
August 20, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, judgment 7/31/17, agreed amended judgment 11/29/17, order 7/21/20. [4947333] [20-2747] (CAH) [Entered: 08/20/2020 02:01 PM]
August 20, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4947329] [20-2747] (CAH) [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Randy Kinder Excavating v. JA Manning Construction Compan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JA Manning Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Junius Bracy Cross Jr.
Represented By: Brigid F. Kennedy
Represented By: Evan B. Gatewood
Represented By: Robert L. Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Re, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricon Precast, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Randy Kinder Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Wayne Willis
Represented By: Jack East III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?