Regional Home Health Care, Inc v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, NCI Information Systems, Inc., an NCI Company, doing business as AdvanceMed Corporation and Does 1-10
Plaintiff / Appellant: Regional Home Health Care, Inc.
Case Number: 20-3239
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 Copies Record Deficiency due on 12/21/2020-- SEE ATTACHED NOTICE. [4984775] [20-3239] (AMT) [Entered: 12/14/2020 02:11 PM]
December 14, 2020 PAPER brief deficiency sent to Mr. Michael John Khouri, for [ # 4982090-2 ], brief Appellant/Petitioner Brief [4984766] [20-3239] (AMT) [Entered: 12/14/2020 02:02 PM]
December 8, 2020 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4982729-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Ms. Jaynie Lilley. Brief of Alex M. Azar II, Does 1-10 and NCI Information Systems, Inc. due 02/03/2021. [4983103] [20-3239] (JPP) [Entered: 12/08/2020 02:14 PM]
December 7, 2020 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/03/2021, filed by Attorney Ms. Jaynie Lilley for Appellee Mr. Alex M. Azar, II w/service 12/07/2020. [4982729] [20-3239] (JL) [Entered: 12/07/2020 04:47 PM]
December 4, 2020 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Regional Home Health Care, Inc. , w/service 12/02/2020 [4982092] [20-3239] (JPP) [Entered: 12/04/2020 02:12 PM]
December 4, 2020 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Regional Home Health Care, Inc.. w/service 12/02/2020 , Length: 6111 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Regional Home Health Care, Inc. due 12/09/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Appellee/Responsive brief of Alex M. Azar II, Does 1-10 and NCI Information Systems, Inc. due on 01/04/2021. [4982090] [20-3239] (JPP) [Entered: 12/04/2020 02:11 PM]
December 3, 2020 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Regional Home Health Care, Inc.. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4981394] [20-3239] (MJK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 07:41 AM]
December 3, 2020 APPELLANT brief of Regional Home Health Care, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4981393] [20-3239] (MJK) [Entered: 12/03/2020 07:40 AM]
November 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Abby C. Wright for Appellee Mr. Alex M. Azar, II w/service 11/12/2020 [4975073] [20-3239] (AW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:24 PM]
November 12, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Jaynie Lilley for Appellee Mr. Alex M. Azar, II w/service 11/12/2020 [4974980] [20-3239] (JL) [Entered: 11/12/2020 12:17 PM]
November 9, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Regional Home Health Care, Inc.. w/service 11/09/2020 [4974138] [20-3239] (MJK) [Entered: 11/09/2020 01:40 PM]
November 9, 2020 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Regional Home Health Care, Inc. - Separate Appendix - w/service 11/09/2020 [4974135] [20-3239] (MJK) [Entered: 11/09/2020 01:39 PM]
November 9, 2020 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Regional Home Health Care, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4974131] [20-3239] (MJK) [Entered: 11/09/2020 01:35 PM]
November 9, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Regional Home Health Care, Inc. - w/service 11/09/2020. [4974129] [20-3239] (MJK) [Entered: 11/09/2020 01:33 PM]
November 9, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Michael J. Khouri for Appellant Regional Home Health Care, Inc. w/service 11/09/2020 [4974125] [20-3239] (MJK) [Entered: 11/09/2020 01:29 PM]
October 28, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by William C. Purdy for Appellees Mr. Alex M. Azar, II and NCI Information Systems, Inc. w/service 10/28/2020 [4970554] [20-3239] (WCP) [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:09 PM]
October 23, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 12/02/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Regional Home Health Care, Inc. due 12/02/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4969152] [20-3239] (AEV) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:18 PM]
October 23, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 9/21/20, Judgment 9/22/20, docket entries, [4969148] [20-3239] (AEV) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:17 PM]
October 23, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4969145] [20-3239] (AEV) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Regional Home Health Care, Inc v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: David Locksley D. Faith II
Represented By: William C. Purdy
Represented By: Abby Wright
Represented By: Jaynie Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NCI Information Systems, Inc., an NCI Company, doing business as AdvanceMed Corporation
Represented By: David Locksley D. Faith II
Represented By: William C. Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Regional Home Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin R. Merrill
Represented By: Michael John Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?