Lee Woolverton v. City of Wardell, et al
Defendant: Tommy Greenwell, Edward Holloway and Western Surety Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lee Woolverton
Defendant / Appellee: Casey Redden, Chris Rudd and City of Wardell
Case Number: 20-3511
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4995853-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Michael Moroni. Brief of Lee Woolverton due 02/22/2021. Appendix due on 02/22/2021. [4996111] [20-3511] (NDW) [Entered: 01/20/2021 01:58 PM]
January 20, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/22/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Moroni for Appellant Mr. Lee Woolverton w/service 01/20/2021. [4995853] [20-3511] (MM) [Entered: 01/20/2021 06:15 AM]
December 15, 2020 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Lee Woolverton - w/service 12/15/2020. [4985204] [20-3511] (MM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 12:50 PM]
December 14, 2020 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Lee Woolverton. w/service 12/14/2020 [4984494] [20-3511] (MM) [Entered: 12/14/2020 08:10 AM]
December 8, 2020 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Lee Woolverton. Transcript ordered from Pretrial and Jury Trial [4982869] [20-3511]--[Edited to note ordered transcripts 12/09/2020 by ALK] (MM) [Entered: 12/08/2020 09:54 AM]
December 3, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Ross A. Bridges for Appellees City of Wardell, Casey Redden and Chris Rudd w/service 12/03/2020 [4981642] [20-3511] (RAB) [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:19 PM]
December 2, 2020 APPEARANCE filed by Michael Moroni for Appellant Mr. Lee Woolverton w/service 12/02/2020 [4981253] [20-3511] (MM) [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:12 PM]
December 2, 2020 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 01/11/2021. Appendix due 01/21/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Lee Woolverton due 01/21/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4981184] [20-3511] (AEV) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:07 PM]
December 2, 2020 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Judgment 8/26/20, Memorandum and Order 11/10/20, docket entries, [4981181] [20-3511] (AEV) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:05 PM]
December 2, 2020 Civil case docketed. [4981177] [20-3511] (AEV) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lee Woolverton v. City of Wardell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lee Woolverton
Represented By: Donald R. Rhodes
Represented By: Michael Moroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Casey Redden
Represented By: Ross A. Bridges
Represented By: Jordan Nicole Hudspith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Rudd
Represented By: Ross A. Bridges
Represented By: Jordan Nicole Hudspith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Wardell
Represented By: Ross A. Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Greenwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?