Adventist Health System, et al v. U.S. Dept. of HHS, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Health Resources and Services Administration, Director, Thomas J. Engels, United Network for Organ Sharing, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary Alex M. Azar, II, Health Resources and Services Administration, Acting Administrator, Diana Espinosa and United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, Xavier Becerra
Plaintiff / Appellant: Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., doing business as AdventHealth Orlando, Medical University Hospital Authority, Alexander Berrios, Jr., University of Kansas Hospital Authority, a body politic and corporate and an independent instrumentality of the State of Kansas, Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, on behalf of Univeristy of Alabama Hospital, University of Iowa and University of Kentucky
Case Number: 21-1589
Filed: March 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 RECORD FILED - APLEE/RES APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 1 volume. Appellees' appendix starts on page A425. [5034412] [21-1589] (NDG) [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:20 PM]
May 11, 2021 BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by United Network for Organ Sharing, w/service 05/11/2021. Length: 12,630 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM United Network for Organ Sharing due 05/17/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Appellants' reply brief remains due May 20, 2021. [5034330] [21-1589] --[Edited 05/11/2021 by BNW to correct docket text] (BNW) [Entered: 05/11/2021 02:07 PM]
May 11, 2021 BRIEF FILED - APPELLEES BRIEF filed by Health Resources and Services Administration and HHS w/service 05/11/2021. Length: 12,961 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Health Resources and Services Administration and United States Department of Health and Human Services due 05/17/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. [5034313] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:51 PM]
May 11, 2021 APPELLEE brief of United Network for Organ Sharing submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5034298] [21-1589] (LTC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:29 PM]
May 11, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Thomas G. Weber for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing w/service 05/11/2021 [5034178] [21-1589] (TGW) [Entered: 05/11/2021 11:09 AM]
May 11, 2021 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Linda T. Coberly for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing. [5034065] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 05/11/2021 09:14 AM]
May 10, 2021 APPELLEE brief of Health Resources and Services Administration and HHS submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5033990] [21-1589] (BH) [Entered: 05/10/2021 07:14 PM]
May 10, 2021 APPELLEE brief of United Network for Organ Sharing submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5033987] [21-1589] (LTC) [Entered: 05/10/2021 06:21 PM]
May 6, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Lauren Gailey for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing w/service 05/06/2021 [5032751] [21-1589] (LG) [Entered: 05/06/2021 10:26 AM]
May 6, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Sean H. Suber for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing w/service 05/06/2021 [5032740] [21-1589] (SHS) [Entered: 05/06/2021 10:12 AM]
April 16, 2021 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5026469-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Bradley Hinshelwood. Brief of Health Resources and Services Administration, United Network for Organ Sharing and United States Department of Health and Human Services due 05/10/2021. No further extensions will be granted. Reply brief of Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky now due 05/20/2021. [5026555] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:58 PM]
April 16, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/10/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Bradley Hinshelwood for Appellees Health Resources and Services Administration and HHS w/service 04/16/2021. [5026469] [21-1589] (BH) [Entered: 04/16/2021 12:44 PM]
April 16, 2021 Please note that this case has been screened for oral argument. The exact date of your oral argument has not been determined at this time. You will be receiving a calendar approximately 4 weeks before the scheduled argument date. Please review the current and future argument dates immediately to determine if you have any conflicts. # Click Here to View Published Argument Calendars and Future Court Session Dates and Locations If you do have conflicts with any of the argument dates, please inform this court by sending a letter using the ECF docketing event 'Correspondence to Court', 'Letter filed' 'regarding availability for oral argument'. Your compliance with this policy will minimize the need for motions to continue or reschedule oral argument. The court also encourages you to notify the clerk if conflicts with these dates develop in the future. The clerk's office takes conflict dates into consideration in scheduling oral arguments but cannot guarantee that every request will be honored. [5026212] [21-1589] (JMM) [Entered: 04/16/2021 08:11 AM]
April 8, 2021 Paper copies Appellants Brief, [ # 5022792-2 ] filed by Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky. 10 paper copies received w/Addendum attached. [5023279] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/08/2021 10:05 AM]
April 7, 2021 RECORD FILED - APLNTS APPENDIX, 2 volumes, 1 boxes. Comments: 2 volumes, 3 copies per volume all in one box. [5023274] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/08/2021 09:59 AM]
April 7, 2021 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky, w/service 04/07/2021. [5022795] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:36 AM]
April 7, 2021 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky w/service 04/07/2021. Length: 12,981 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky due 04/12/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief(s) of Health Resources and Services Administration, United Network for Organ Sharing and United States Department of Health and Human Services due on 04/26/2021. [5022792] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:34 AM]
April 6, 2021 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5022760] [21-1589] (JMR) [Entered: 04/06/2021 05:30 PM]
April 6, 2021 APPELLANT brief of Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5022759] [21-1589] (JMR) [Entered: 04/06/2021 05:28 PM]
April 6, 2021 Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Glenn L. Krinsky for Appellants University of Iowa, Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky and Alexander Berrios, Jr.. New electronic copy of addendum due on 04/12/2021. [5022718] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:08 PM]
April 6, 2021 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Mr. Glenn L. Krinsky for Appellants University of Iowa, Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky and Alexander Berrios, Jr. and Mr. Jacob Moshe Roth for Appellants University of Iowa, Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky and Alexander Berrios, Jr. [5022715] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:02 PM]
April 6, 2021 PUBLIC DOCKET NOTE: Xavier Becerra has been substituted for Alex M. Azar, II as appellee in this case. Diana Espinosa has been substituted for Thomas J. Engels as appellee in this case. [5022711] [21-1589] (BNW) [Entered: 04/06/2021 03:57 PM]
April 6, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Michael A. Carvin for Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky w/service 04/06/2021 [5022434] [21-1589] (MAC) [Entered: 04/06/2021 11:33 AM]
April 5, 2021 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5022114] [21-1589] (JMR) [Entered: 04/05/2021 03:44 PM]
April 5, 2021 APPELLANT brief of Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky and University of Iowa submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5022111] [21-1589] (JMR) [Entered: 04/05/2021 03:42 PM]
April 5, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Jacob (Yaakov) Roth for Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky w/service 04/05/2021 [5021976] [21-1589] (JMR) [Entered: 04/05/2021 01:33 PM]
March 26, 2021 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/26/2021 [5019142] [21-1589] (SHL) [Entered: 03/26/2021 02:41 PM]
March 25, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing. - FOR CAL [5018580] [21-1589] (LTC) [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:54 PM]
March 22, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky. - FOR CAL [5016879] [21-1589] (SHL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:44 AM]
March 22, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Stephen H. Locher for Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky w/service 03/22/2021 [5016875] [21-1589] (SHL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:42 AM]
March 14, 2021 JUDGE ORDER [ # 5014260-2 ] The emergency motion for stay filed by Appellants University of Iowa, Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky and Alexander Berrios, Jr.. is denied. The motion for an expedited appeal has been considered and is granted. The following briefing schedule is established. Appellants' brief is due April 5, 2021; Appellees' brief is due April 26, 2021; Appellants' reply brief is due May 6, 2021. Adp Mar 2021 [5014282] [21-1589] (RJW) [Entered: 03/14/2021 08:11 PM]
March 14, 2021 REPLY to response [ # 5014270-2 ], response [ # 5014264-2 ] filed by Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky w/service 03/14/2021. [5014274] [21-1589] (SHL) [Entered: 03/14/2021 06:35 PM]
March 14, 2021 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay [ # 5014260-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Bradley Hinshelwood for Appellees Health Rescources and Services Administration and HHS , w/service 03/14/2021. [5014270] [21-1589] (BH) [Entered: 03/14/2021 05:04 PM]
March 14, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Linda T. Coberly for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing w/service 03/14/2021 [5014265] [21-1589] (LTC) [Entered: 03/14/2021 02:46 PM]
March 14, 2021 RESPONSE in opposition to motion for stay [ # 5014260-2 ] filed by Attorney Ms. Linda T. Coberly for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing , w/service 03/14/2021. [5014264] [21-1589] (LTC) [Entered: 03/14/2021 02:36 PM]
March 14, 2021 DOCUMENT FILED - Exhibits filed by Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky. w/service 03/14/2021 [5014262] [21-1589] (EDG) [Entered: 03/14/2021 02:29 PM]
March 14, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Brad Hinshelwood for Appellees HHS and Health Rescources and Services Administration w/service 03/14/2021 [5014261] [21-1589] (BH) [Entered: 03/14/2021 02:21 PM]
March 14, 2021 EMERGENCY MOTION for stay, filed by Appellants Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., Alexander Berrios, Jr., Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, Medical University Hospital Authority, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority and University of Kentucky w/service 03/14/2021. [5014260] [21-1589] (EDG) [Entered: 03/14/2021 02:20 PM]
March 14, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Orders dated 3/12/21 and 3/13/21 [5014259] [21-1589] (EDG) [Entered: 03/14/2021 02:16 PM]
March 14, 2021 Civil case docketed. [5014258] [21-1589] (EDG) [Entered: 03/14/2021 01:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Adventist Health System, et al v. U.S. Dept. of HHS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Health Resources and Services Administration, Director, Thomas J. Engels
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Newman
Represented By: Michael Leon Drezner
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United Network for Organ Sharing
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Carter
Represented By: Linda T. Coberly
Represented By: Melanie L. Lee
Represented By: Daniel D. Rubinstein
Represented By: Thomas Gerald Weber
Represented By: Lance W. Lange
Represented By: James W. Randall
Represented By: Sean H. Suber
Represented By: Lauren Gailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Newman
Represented By: Michael Leon Drezner
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Health Resources and Services Administration, Acting Administrator, Diana Espinosa
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Newman
Represented By: Michael Leon Drezner
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Newman
Represented By: Michael Leon Drezner
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Adventist Health System/SunBelt, Inc., doing business as AdventHealth Orlando
Represented By: Peter C. Canfield
Represented By: Richard Salgado
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Represented By: Glenn L. Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Represented By: Kelsey L. Smith
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Medical University Hospital Authority
Represented By: Peter C. Canfield
Represented By: Richard Salgado
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Represented By: Glenn L. Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Represented By: Kelsey L. Smith
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alexander Berrios, Jr.
Represented By: Peter C. Canfield
Represented By: Richard Salgado
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Represented By: Glenn L. Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Represented By: Kelsey L. Smith
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: University of Kansas Hospital Authority, a body politic and corporate and an independent instrumentality of the State of Kansas
Represented By: Peter C. Canfield
Represented By: Richard Salgado
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Represented By: Glenn L. Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Represented By: Kelsey L. Smith
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Board of Trustees of the University of Alabama, on behalf of Univeristy of Alabama Hospital
Represented By: Peter C. Canfield
Represented By: Richard Salgado
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Represented By: Glenn L. Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Represented By: Kelsey L. Smith
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: University of Iowa
Represented By: Peter C. Canfield
Represented By: Richard Salgado
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Represented By: Glenn L. Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Represented By: Kelsey L. Smith
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: University of Kentucky
Represented By: Peter C. Canfield
Represented By: Richard Salgado
Represented By: Ryan Gene Koopmans
Represented By: Glenn L. Krinsky
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Autumn Hamit Patterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Locher
Represented By: Kelsey L. Smith
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?