Deverick Scott v. Dexter Payne, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Bphens, Lieutenant, VSM Unit, Does, All Officers at Pine Bluff Office, James Gibson, Warden, Varner Unit, Carroll, Major, VSM Unit, James Plummer, Lieutenant, Varner SuperMax, ADC, Wendy Kelley, Director, ADC, Malone, Female Officer, VSM Unit, Lord, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax, ADC, Sexton, Officer, VSM Unit, Dexter Payne, Assistant Director, ADC, Taylor, Captain, VSM Unit, Burchfield, Lieutenant, VSM Unit, Mary Gayden, Officer, VSM Unit, Shipman, Warden, VSM Unit, Dexter Payne, Director, ADC and Dale Reed, Assistant Director, ADC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Deverick Scott
Case Number: 21-1852
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 BRIEF FILED - PRO SE APPELLANT BRIEF w/ADDENDUM ATTACHED filed by Mr. Deverick Scott, w/service 06/08/2021. Length: 7,889 words (Copie: 5) Brief of James Plummer due on 07/08/2021. [5043170] [21-1852] (HAG) [Entered: 06/08/2021 11:56 AM]
June 4, 2021 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5042297-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Deverick Scott. Brief of Deverick Scott due 06/14/2021 [5042300] [21-1852] (CRJ) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:52 PM]
June 4, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 06/14/2021, filed by Appellant Mr. Deverick Scott w/service by USCA8 06/04/2021. [5042297] [21-1852] (CRJ) [Entered: 06/04/2021 03:49 PM]
June 4, 2021 CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. [5042003] [21-1852] (CJO) [Entered: 06/04/2021 08:37 AM]
May 24, 2021 CLERK ORDER: Granting [ # 5038569-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Deverick Scott. Brief of Deverick Scott due 06/02/2021. [5038571] [21-1852] (HAG) [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:11 PM]
May 24, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 06/02/2021, filed by Appellant Mr. Deverick Scott w/service by USCA8 05/24/2021. [5038569] [21-1852] (HAG) [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:07 PM]
April 16, 2021 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Deverick Scott due 05/26/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5026384] [21-1852] (CJO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 11:14 AM]
April 16, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Proposed Findings and Recommendation 02/04/2021, Order 03/29/2021, Judgment 03/29/2021, and Order 04/15/2021. [5026371] [21-1852] (CJO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 11:08 AM]
April 16, 2021 Prisoner case docketed. [5026364] [21-1852] (CJO) [Entered: 04/16/2021 11:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Deverick Scott v. Dexter Payne, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bphens, Lieutenant, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does, All Officers at Pine Bluff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Gibson, Warden, Varner Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carroll, Major, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Plummer, Lieutenant, Varner SuperMax, ADC
Represented By: Rosalyn Lynette Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wendy Kelley, Director, ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Malone, Female Officer, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lord, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax, ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sexton, Officer, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dexter Payne, Assistant Director, ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Taylor, Captain, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Burchfield, Lieutenant, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary Gayden, Officer, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shipman, Warden, VSM Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dexter Payne, Director, ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dale Reed, Assistant Director, ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Deverick Scott
Represented By: Deverick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?