Glenda Brunk v. Conseco Bank, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. Bank, N.A., As Trustee for Conseco Finance Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-a and Conseco Bank, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Glenda Brunk
Case Number: 21-1891
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 CLERK ORDER: The motion to stay the briefing schedule pending the district court's determination of the Rule 59 motion is granted [ # 5036368-2 ]. The parties are requested to provide a status report by July 1, 2021 of the district courts decision. [5040674] [21-1891] (BNW) [Entered: 06/01/2021 09:47 AM]
May 17, 2021 CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance pending ruling on the motion for stay of appeal. [5036378] [21-1891] (BNW) [Entered: 05/17/2021 04:20 PM]
May 17, 2021 MOTION for stay of appeal pending motion for reconsideration filed by Appellant Ms. Glenda Brunk w/service 05/17/2021 by USCA8. [5036368] [21-1891] (BNW) [Entered: 05/17/2021 04:16 PM]
April 27, 2021 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. - FOR CAL [5029602] [21-1891] (AMR) [Entered: 04/27/2021 01:24 PM]
April 27, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Alan M. Ritchie for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. w/service 04/27/2021 [5029600] [21-1891] (AMR) [Entered: 04/27/2021 01:22 PM]
April 27, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Anna-Katrina S. Christakis for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. w/service 04/27/2021 [5029599] [21-1891] (ASC) [Entered: 04/27/2021 01:20 PM]
April 22, 2021 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Glenda Brunk due 06/01/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5028031] [21-1891] (AEV) [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:34 AM]
April 22, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 4/9/19, Memorandum and order 3/31/21, Judgment 3/31/21, Text Order to Vacate TRO 4/6/21, docket entries, [5028027] [21-1891] (AEV) [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:33 AM]
April 22, 2021 Civil case docketed. [5028024] [21-1891] (AEV) [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Glenda Brunk v. Conseco Bank, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Bank, N.A., As Trustee for Conseco Finance Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-a
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Represented By: Alan M. Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Conseco Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Glenda Brunk
Represented By: Glenda Brunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?