Christopher Thornsberry v. Roosevelt Barden, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Christopher Thornsberry
Defendant / Appellee: Anthony Jackson, Deputy Warden, East Arkansas Regional Unit, Judy Taylor, PREA Coordinator, Arkansas Department of Correction, Roosevelt Barden, Captain, East Arkansas Regional Unit, Gaylon Lay, Warden, East Arkansas Regional Unit, Justine M. Minor, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Arkansas Department of Correction, Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction, Fidel Cobb, Lieutenant, East Arkansas Regional Unit, Terrie L. Banister, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Arkansas Department of Correction and Stephen Lane, Captain, East Arkansas Regional Unit
Case Number: 21-2029
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 20, 2021 Christopher Thornsberry v. Roosevelt Barden

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 MEMORANDUM of Appellant Mr. Christopher Thornsberry in support of originating court document notice of appeal, Doc No. [ # 5032813-2 ], w/service 05/27/2021. [5039963] [21-2029] (CJO) [Entered: 05/27/2021 02:32 PM]
May 27, 2021 MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Thornsberry, w/service 05/27/2021. [5039959] [21-2029] (CJO) [Entered: 05/27/2021 02:25 PM]
May 27, 2021 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Thornsberry, w/service 05/27/2021. [5039953] [21-2029] (CJO) [Entered: 05/27/2021 02:21 PM]
May 6, 2021 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5032832] [21-2029] (CJO) [Entered: 05/06/2021 11:53 AM]
May 6, 2021 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 06/03/2021, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [5032816] [21-2029] (CJO) [Entered: 05/06/2021 11:42 AM]
May 6, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Proposed Findings and Recommendations 01/22/2021, Order 04/22/2021, Judgment 04/22/2021, and Order 05/06/2021.[5032813] [21-2029] (CJO) [Entered: 05/06/2021 11:41 AM]
May 6, 2021 Prisoner case docketed. [5032806] [21-2029] (CJO) [Entered: 05/06/2021 11:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christopher Thornsberry v. Roosevelt Barden, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Thornsberry
Represented By: Christopher Thornsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony Jackson, Deputy Warden, East Arkansas Regional Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judy Taylor, PREA Coordinator, Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Roosevelt Barden, Captain, East Arkansas Regional Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gaylon Lay, Warden, East Arkansas Regional Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Justine M. Minor, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fidel Cobb, Lieutenant, East Arkansas Regional Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Terrie L. Banister, Disciplinary Hearing Officer, Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen Lane, Captain, East Arkansas Regional Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?