Derrick Estell v. Walter Washington, et al
Defendant: Layton, Mental Health Workder, Varner SuperMax, Brandon C. Carroll, Major, Varner SuperMax, Shipman, Warden, Varner SuperMax, James Gibson, Warden, Varner SuperMax, Ken Cunninham, Nurse, Varner SuperMax, Marshall Dale Reed, Whitney Knowles, Nurse, Varner SuperMax and Dexter Payne, Director, ADC
Defendant / Appellee: Walter Washington, Lieutenant, Varner SuperMax, Solomon Tobi, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax, Douglas E. Boultinghouse, Lieutenant, Varner SuperMax, Edward O'Connor, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax, Jude Ogbozor, Corporal, Varner SuperMax, Rickey Minor, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax, Jonathan Martin, Captain, Varner SuperMax, Carolyn Wallace, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax, Tyquarius Royal, Corporal, Varner SuperMax and Carlos Garrison, Officer
Plaintiff / Appellant: Derrick Estell
Case Number: 21-2082
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 MANDATE ISSUED. [5045614] [21-2082] (CRJ) [Entered: 06/15/2021 02:23 PM]
June 3, 2021 JUDGE ORDER:Denying [ # 5040953-2 ] motion for extension of time to file rehearing filed by Appellant Derrick Estell. Adp May 2021 [5041652] [21-2082] (CRJ) [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:41 AM]
June 2, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of amended notice of appeal filed 6/1/2021. [5044956] [21-2082] (CMH) [Entered: 06/14/2021 12:55 PM]
June 1, 2021 MOTION for extension of time to file petition for rehearing, filed by Appellant Derrick Estell w/service by USCA8 06/01/2021. [5040953] [21-2082] (CRJ) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:59 PM]
May 18, 2021 JUDGMENT FILED - Appeal dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. RALPH R. ERICKSON, DAVID R. STRAS and JONATHAN A. KOBES Adp May 2021 [5036926] [21-2082] (CRJ) [Entered: 05/18/2021 02:48 PM]
May 13, 2021 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5035422] [21-2082] (CMH) [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:34 PM]
May 13, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Partial Recommended Disposition filed 3/16/2021< Order filed 4/1/2021, and Order filed 5/13/2021. [5035416] [21-2082] (CMH) [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:31 PM]
May 13, 2021 Prisoner case docketed. [5035401] [21-2082] (CMH) [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Derrick Estell v. Walter Washington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Walter Washington, Lieutenant, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Solomon Tobi, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Douglas E. Boultinghouse, Lieutenant, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward O'Connor, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jude Ogbozor, Corporal, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rickey Minor, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan Martin, Captain, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carolyn Wallace, Sergeant, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tyquarius Royal, Corporal, Varner SuperMax
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carlos Garrison, Officer
Represented By: Sammie P. Strange Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layton, Mental Health Workder, Varner SuperMax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon C. Carroll, Major, Varner SuperMax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shipman, Warden, Varner SuperMax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson, Warden, Varner SuperMax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cunninham, Nurse, Varner SuperMax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Dale Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Knowles, Nurse, Varner SuperMax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne, Director, ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Derrick Estell
Represented By: Derrick Estell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?