John Lukach v. Dexter Payne
Petitioner / Appellant: John Richard Lukach, Jr.
Respondent / Appellee: Dexter Payne, Director of the Arkansas Division of Correction
Case Number: 21-2691
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 DOCUMENT FILED - request for copies of all responses and orders filed in case 21-2691 filed by Mr. John Richard Lukach, Jr.. w/service 09/24/2021. NOTE: All requested copies are being mailed with this NDA. [5080568] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 09/24/2021 03:34 PM]
September 2, 2021 DOCUMENT FILED - Notice of Address Change and request for copies filed by Mr. John Richard Lukach, Jr. w/service 09/03/2021. [5073048] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 09/03/2021 02:31 PM]
August 17, 2021 CLERK ORDER:Denying [ # 5066519-2 ] motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Mr. John Richard Lukach, Jr.. Appellant's has previously been granted permission to appeal in forma pauperis in this case and therefore the motion is denied as moot. [5066520] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:59 PM]
August 16, 2021 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Mr. John Richard Lukach, Jr. w/service 08/17/2021. [5066519] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:55 PM]
August 16, 2021 APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability, filed by Appellant Mr. John Richard Lukach, Jr. w/service 08/17/2021 [5066516] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:49 PM]
July 30, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order filed 2/1/2021, Report & Recommendation filed 3/1/2021, Order filed 5/20/2021, Order filed 6/7/2021, and Order filed 7/28/2021. [5060250] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 07/30/2021 09:51 AM]
July 30, 2021 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5060251] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 07/30/2021 09:52 AM]
July 30, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Brooke Jackson Gasaway for Appellee Dexter Payne w/service 07/30/2021 [5060624] [21-2691] (BJG) [Entered: 07/30/2021 03:51 PM]
July 30, 2021 Prisoner case docketed. [5060246] [21-2691] (CMH) [Entered: 07/30/2021 09:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Lukach v. Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: John Richard Lukach, Jr.
Represented By: John Richard Lukach Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Dexter Payne, Director of the Arkansas Division of Correction
Represented By: Brooke Jackson Gasaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?