Quantel Lotts v. David Vandergriff
Petitioner / Appellant: Quantel Lancel Lotts
Respondent / Appellee: David Vandergriff, in his capacity as Warden, Eastern Reception, Diagnostic and Correctional Center
Case Number: 21-2892
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 DOCUMENT FILED - Receipt: Filing Fee Paid to District Court. [5074435] [21-2892] (CJO) [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:49 AM]
September 9, 2021 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 21-2892: paid - cs] [5074439] [21-2892] (CJO) [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:52 AM]
September 9, 2021 On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under [Rule 27/Rule 5/Rule 21/Rule 35/Rule 40], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your Application for certificate of appealability, [ # 5074285-2 ], submitted by Mr. Quantel Lancel Lotts in 21-2892 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion .[21-2892] (CJO) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:09 AM]
September 9, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Alicia A. D'Addario for Appellant Mr. Quantel Lancel Lotts correcting [ # 5074285-2 ] Application filed by Appellant. [5074771] [21-2892] (AAD) [Entered: 09/09/2021 05:25 PM]
September 8, 2021 APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability, filed by Appellant Mr. Quantel Lancel Lotts w/service 09/08/2021 [5074285] [21-2892] (AAD) [Entered: 09/08/2021 11:07 PM]
August 25, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Kayla Vinson for Appellant Mr. Quantel Lancel Lotts w/service 08/25/2021 [5069602] [21-2892] (KV) [Entered: 08/25/2021 05:11 PM]
August 25, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Bryan A. Stevenson for Appellant Mr. Quantel Lancel Lotts w/service 08/25/2021 [5069426] [21-2892] (BAS) [Entered: 08/25/2021 01:48 PM]
August 25, 2021 APPEARANCE filed by Alicia A. D'Addario for Appellant Mr. Quantel Lancel Lotts w/service 08/25/2021 [5069421] [21-2892] (AAD) [Entered: 08/25/2021 01:45 PM]
August 24, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order 07/29/2021, and Judgment 08/02/2021.[5068706] [21-2892] (CJO) [Entered: 08/24/2021 11:31 AM]
August 24, 2021 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 09/14/2021, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5068710] [21-2892] (CJO) [Entered: 08/24/2021 11:32 AM]
August 24, 2021 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5068717] [21-2892] (CJO) [Entered: 08/24/2021 11:36 AM]
August 24, 2021 Prisoner case docketed. [5068697] [21-2892] (CJO) [Entered: 08/24/2021 11:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Quantel Lotts v. David Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Quantel Lancel Lotts
Represented By: Alicia A. D'Addario
Represented By: Bryan Allen Stevenson
Represented By: Kayla Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: David Vandergriff, in his capacity as Warden, Eastern Reception, Diagnostic and Correctional Center
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Logan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Spillane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?