Gregory Stevenson v. Wes Drury, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Gregory E. Stevenson
Defendant / Appellee: Wes Drury, Sheriff, Donald Chambers, Jail Administrator, Matt Scroggins and Ryan Doe, Co-worker for the Sheriff Department
Case Number: 21-3205
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 MANDATE ISSUED. [5102764] [21-3205] (NDG) [Entered: 11/30/2021 11:45 AM]
November 2, 2021 JUDGMENT FILED - This case is summarily affirmed in accordance with Eighth Circuit Rule 47A. JAMES B. LOKEN, STEVEN M. COLLOTON and L. STEVEN GRASZ Adp Oct 2021 [5093182] [21-3205] (NDG) [Entered: 11/02/2021 11:23 AM]
October 27, 2021 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges James B. Loken, Steven M. Colloton, L. Steven Grasz in St. Louis [5093170] [21-3205] (NDG) [Entered: 11/02/2021 11:13 AM]
October 4, 2021 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5083300] [21-3205] (CMH) [Entered: 10/04/2021 01:41 PM]
October 4, 2021 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Order both filed 8/25/2021, and Memorandum & Order filed 10/1/2021. [5083294] [21-3205] (CMH) [Entered: 10/04/2021 01:38 PM]
October 4, 2021 Prisoner case docketed. [5083288] [21-3205] (CMH) [Entered: 10/04/2021 01:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gregory Stevenson v. Wes Drury, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory E. Stevenson
Represented By: Gregory E. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wes Drury, Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donald Chambers, Jail Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matt Scroggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ryan Doe, Co-worker for the Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?