Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, et al v. Lankford Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellee: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, a Trust Fund, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, a Trust Fund, Albert Bond, Trustee of the Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Trustee of the Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Trustee of the Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Trustee of the Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Brian Murphy, Trustee of the St. LouisKansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Trustee of the Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund and Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis and Virgil Kloth, Trustee of the St. LouisKansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Trustee of the Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Defendant / Appellant: Lankford Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 22-2007
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 ***LOCKED***LETTER from Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. regarding Request for extension to file and serve the brief and joint appendix. w/service 07/01/2022 [5173539] [22-2007]--[Edited 07/01/2022 by NDG] This document is locked as it has been refiled by counsel 7/1/2022 under the correct event type. See document ID 5173632 (OA) [Entered: 07/01/2022 02:40 PM]
July 1, 2022 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 07/28/2022, filed by Attorney Mr. Olawale Akinmoladun for Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. w/service 07/01/2022. [5173632] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 07/01/2022 03:54 PM]
July 1, 2022 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5173632-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Olawale Akinmoladun. Brief of Lankford Enterprises, Inc. due 07/28/2022. Appendix due on 07/28/2022. [5173652] [22-2007] (NDG) [Entered: 07/01/2022 04:30 PM]
June 27, 2022 CLERK ORDER: Appellant's motion for leave to amend the method of appendix preparation [ # 5171116-2 ] is granted. [5171419] [22-2007] (NDG) [Entered: 06/27/2022 09:52 AM]
June 27, 2022 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. - Joint Appendix - w/service 06/27/2022 [5171513] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 06/27/2022 11:14 AM]
June 24, 2022 MOTION Leave to Amend the Method of Appendix Preparation, filed by Attorney Mr. Olawale Akinmoladun for Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. w/service 06/24/2022. [5171116] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 06/24/2022 02:17 PM]
June 9, 2022 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees Mr. Albert Bond, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mr. Donald E. Greenwell, III, Mr. Virgil Kloth, Mr. Brian Murphy, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund and St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council. w/service 06/09/2022 [5166289] [22-2007] (AS) [Entered: 06/09/2022 03:21 PM]
June 3, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Aaron D Schuster for Appellees Mr. Albert Bond, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mr. Donald E. Greenwell, III, Mr. Virgil Kloth, Mr. Brian Murphy, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund and St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council w/service 06/03/2022 [5164443] [22-2007] (AS) [Entered: 06/03/2022 04:57 PM]
June 3, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Mark A Kistler for Appellees Mr. Albert Bond, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mr. Donald E. Greenwell, III, Mr. Virgil Kloth, Mr. Brian Murphy, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund and St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council w/service 06/03/2022 [5164444] [22-2007] (AS) [Entered: 06/03/2022 04:59 PM]
June 3, 2022 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed by Aaron D Schuster for Appellees Mr. Albert Bond, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mr. Donald E. Greenwell, III, Mr. Virgil Kloth, Mr. Brian Murphy, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund and St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council w/service 06/03/2022 [5164442] [22-2007]--[Edited 06/06/2022 by NDG] This document has been locked as a corrected form has been filed by counsel. See document ID 5164443 (AS) [Entered: 06/03/2022 04:52 PM]
June 3, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Barry L. Pickens for Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. w/service 06/03/2022 [5164265] [22-2007] (BLP) [Entered: 06/03/2022 12:42 PM]
May 31, 2022 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. - Separate Appendix - w/service 05/31/2022 [5162926] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:41 PM]
May 31, 2022 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc.. w/service 05/31/2022 [5162928] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:43 PM]
May 31, 2022 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc.. No Transcript[5162922] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:39 PM]
May 31, 2022 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. - w/service 05/31/2022. [5162931] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:44 PM]
May 17, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Douglas M. Weems for Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. w/service 05/17/2022 [5158368] [22-2007] (DMW) [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:49 PM]
May 17, 2022 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5158402] [22-2007] (DMW) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:34 PM]
May 17, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Olawale O. Akinmoladun for Appellant Lankford Enterprises, Inc. w/service 05/17/2022 [5158424] [22-2007] (OA) [Entered: 05/17/2022 03:00 PM]
May 16, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 11/5/21, order 1/3/22, judgment 4/13/22,. [5157651] [22-2007] (CAH) [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:22 AM]
May 16, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5157648] [22-2007] (CAH) [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:19 AM]
May 16, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 06/27/2022. Appendix due 07/07/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Lankford Enterprises, Inc. due 07/07/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5157654] [22-2007] (CAH) [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund, et al v. Lankford Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, a Trust Fund
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, a Trust Fund
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Albert Bond, Trustee of the Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Trustee of the Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Trustee of the Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donald E. Greenwell, III, Trustee of the Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brian Murphy, Trustee of the St. LouisKansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Trustee of the Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund and Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Virgil Kloth, Trustee of the St. LouisKansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Trustee of the Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Mark Aloysius Kistler
Represented By: Michael Gerard Newbold
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Lankford Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Olawale Akinmoladun
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Barry L. Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?