Naoteru Tsuruta v. Sarah Tsuruta
Plaintiff / Appellee: Naoteru Tsuruta
Defendant / Appellant: Sarah Margaret Tsuruta
Case Number: 22-3014
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 5218101-2 ] filed by Sarah Margaret Tsuruta 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [5219855] [22-3014] (NDG) [Entered: 11/21/2022 02:08 PM]
November 21, 2022 RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 1 volume [5219860] [22-3014] (NDG) [Entered: 11/21/2022 02:11 PM]
November 15, 2022 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. John D. Kershman, I for Appellant Sarah Margaret Tsuruta. [5217933] [22-3014] (NDG) [Entered: 11/15/2022 10:34 AM]
November 15, 2022 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Sarah Margaret Tsuruta , w/service 11/15/2022 [5217953] [22-3014] (NDG) [Entered: 11/15/2022 10:54 AM]
November 15, 2022 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Sarah Margaret Tsuruta w/service 11/15/2022, Length: 10,283 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Sarah Margaret Tsuruta due 11/21/2022 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Naoteru Tsuruta due on 12/15/2022 [5218101] [22-3014] (NDG) [Entered: 11/15/2022 02:07 PM]
November 15, 2022 APPELLANT brief of Sarah Margaret Tsuruta submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5217971] [22-3014] (JDK) [Entered: 11/15/2022 11:12 AM]
November 14, 2022 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Sarah Margaret Tsuruta. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5217551] [22-3014] (JDK) [Entered: 11/14/2022 12:50 PM]
November 14, 2022 APPELLANT brief of Sarah Margaret Tsuruta submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5217548] [22-3014] (JDK) [Entered: 11/14/2022 12:49 PM]
November 3, 2022 RECORD FILED - TRIAL TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #35 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / EMSL, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 08/05/2022, No. of Pgs.: 249, Court Reporter: Madden, Gayle D. [5214449] [22-3014] (STL) [Entered: 11/03/2022 10:02 AM]
October 17, 2022 JUDGE ORDER:Denying [ # 5204589-2 ] motion for stay of implementation of judgment filed by Mr. John D. Kershman, I. Adp Oct 2022 [5208379] [22-3014] (AT) [Entered: 10/17/2022 12:23 PM]
October 5, 2022 RESPONSE in opposition to Motion for Stay of Implementation of Judgment [5205215-2] filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan Marks for Appellee Naoteru Tsuruta ,. [5205215] [22-3014]--[Edited to include full name of pleading 10/06/2022 by AT] (JM) [Entered: 10/05/2022 03:42 PM]
October 4, 2022 MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. John D. Kershman, I for Appellant Sarah Margaret Tsuruta w/service 10/04/2022. [5204589] [22-3014] (JDK) [Entered: 10/04/2022 01:04 PM]
September 23, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum Opinion and Order 09/19/2022, and Judgment 09/19/2022. [5201248] [22-3014] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:34 AM]
September 23, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/02/2022. Appendix due 11/14/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Sarah Margaret Tsuruta due 11/14/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5201252] [22-3014] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:38 AM]
September 23, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5201242] [22-3014] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Naoteru Tsuruta v. Sarah Tsuruta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Naoteru Tsuruta
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Marks
Represented By: Jonathan Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sarah Margaret Tsuruta
Represented By: John D. Kershman I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?