Jordan-A Crawford v. U.S. Department of State, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jordan-A Crawford, ex rel Jordan Alexander Crawford
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of State, United States Department of Justice and State of Missouri
Case Number: 22-3019
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the district court is summarily affirmed under 8th Circuit Rule 47A(a), except that the dismissal is modified to be without prejudice. RAYMOND W. GRUENDER, DUANE BENTON and L. STEVEN GRASZ Adp Nov 2022 [5216456] [22-3019] (AT) [Entered: 11/09/2022 09:56 AM]
November 4, 2022 CASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Raymond W. Gruender, Duane Benton, L. Steven Grasz in St. Louis [5216425] [22-3019] (AT) [Entered: 11/09/2022 09:22 AM]
October 17, 2022 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 22-3019: In Forma Pauperis]. [5208357] [22-3019] (CJO) [Entered: 10/17/2022 12:00 PM]
October 17, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 10/12/2022, Order Granting In Forma Pauperis. [5208355] [22-3019] (CJO) [Entered: 10/17/2022 11:59 AM]
September 23, 2022 CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5201449] [22-3019] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:46 PM]
September 23, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum and Order 08/19/2022, Order of Dismissal 08/19/2022, and Order 09/22/2022. [5201445] [22-3019] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:42 PM]
September 23, 2022 CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 10/14/2022, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5201447] [22-3019] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:44 PM]
September 23, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5201441] [22-3019] (CJO) [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jordan-A Crawford v. U.S. Department of State, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jordan-A Crawford, ex rel Jordan Alexander Crawford
Represented By: Jordan-A Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?