One Love Housing, LLC, et al v. City of Anoka, MN
Plaintiff / Appellee: One Love Housing, LLC, Timothy McNellis and Brandon Severson
Defendant / Appellant: City of Anoka, Minnesota
Case Number: 22-3071
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Accommodation

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 15, 2024 Summary One Love Housing, LLC v. City of Anoka, MN

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by City of Anoka. w/service 11/28/2022 , Length: 10,017 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM City of Anoka due 12/05/2022 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Timothy McNellis, One Love Housing, LLC and Brandon Severson due on 12/28/2022 [5221425] [22-3071] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/28/2022 12:59 PM]
November 28, 2022 APPELLANT brief of City of Anoka submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5221396] [22-3071] (MAC) [Entered: 11/28/2022 12:01 PM]
November 28, 2022 ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant City of Anoka , w/service 11/28/2022 [5221238] [22-3071] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/28/2022 09:40 AM]
November 28, 2022 Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Michelle A. Christy for Appellant City of Anoka. [5221230] [22-3071] (CRJ) [Entered: 11/28/2022 09:33 AM]
November 23, 2022 Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by City of Anoka. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5221096] [22-3071] (MAC) [Entered: 11/23/2022 06:43 PM]
November 23, 2022 APPELLANT brief of City of Anoka submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5221095] [22-3071] (MAC) [Entered: 11/23/2022 06:41 PM]
October 26, 2022 RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #118 [Only Electronic Copy Received - No Paper Copy on File], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 04/30/2020, No. of Pgs.: 44, Court Reporter: Rogge, Renee [5211707] [22-3071] (STL) [Entered: 10/26/2022 11:38 AM]
October 18, 2022 STATEMENT of issues and Designation of Record filed by Appellant City of Anoka - w/service 10/18/2022. [5209088] [22-3071]--[Edited 10/18/2022 by CRJ. Entry edited to add Designation of record notice.] (MAC) [Entered: 10/18/2022 04:30 PM]
October 18, 2022 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant City of Anoka. Transcript ordered on Friday, October 14, 2022 [5209083] [22-3071] (MAC) [Entered: 10/18/2022 04:27 PM]
October 18, 2022 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant City of Anoka - Separate Appendix - w/service 10/18/2022 [5209078] [22-3071] (MAC) [Entered: 10/18/2022 04:25 PM]
October 18, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Michelle A. Christy for Appellant City of Anoka w/service 10/18/2022 [5209068] [22-3071] (MAC) [Entered: 10/18/2022 04:16 PM]
October 18, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Jessica Schwie for Appellant City of Anoka w/service 10/18/2022 [5209065] [22-3071] (JES) [Entered: 10/18/2022 04:12 PM]
October 6, 2022 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees One Love Housing, LLC and Timothy McNellis. - FOR CAL [5205321] [22-3071] (SB) [Entered: 10/06/2022 08:30 AM]
October 5, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Scott A. Benson for Appellees One Love Housing, LLC and Timothy McNellis w/service 10/05/2022 [5205271] [22-3071] (SB) [Entered: 10/05/2022 04:43 PM]
October 4, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 5/5/20, Order on atty fees 7/22/22, Order for Dismissal 9/20/22, and Judgment 9/21/22 [5204744] [22-3071] (MMH) [Entered: 10/04/2022 04:08 PM]
October 4, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/14/2022. Appendix due 11/23/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, City of Anoka due 11/23/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5204747] [22-3071] (MMH) [Entered: 10/04/2022 04:09 PM]
October 4, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5204728] [22-3071] (MMH) [Entered: 10/04/2022 03:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: One Love Housing, LLC, et al v. City of Anoka, MN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: One Love Housing, LLC
Represented By: Scott Benson
Represented By: Mary Cate Cicero
Represented By: Fabian S. Hoffner
Represented By: Steven G. Polin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Timothy McNellis
Represented By: Scott Benson
Represented By: Mary Cate Cicero
Represented By: Fabian S. Hoffner
Represented By: Steven G. Polin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brandon Severson
Represented By: Scott Benson
Represented By: Mary Cate Cicero
Represented By: Fabian S. Hoffner
Represented By: Steven G. Polin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: City of Anoka, Minnesota
Represented By: Michelle A. Christy
Represented By: Jessica E. Schwie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?