United States v. Eric Klase
Plaintiff / Appellee: United States of America
Defendant / Appellant: Eric Brian Klase
Case Number: 22-3156
Filed: October 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Stephen C. Moss for Appellant Mr. Eric Brian Klase w/service 11/28/2022 [5221536] [22-3156] (SCM) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:00 PM]
November 18, 2022 MOTION to hold case in abeyance pending the disposition of Appeal No. 22-2324, filed by Attorney Mr. David Randolph Mercer for Appellant Mr. Eric Brian Klase w/service 11/18/2022. [5219224] [22-3156]--[Edited 11/18/2022 by HAG to correct relief] (DRM) [Entered: 11/18/2022 10:26 AM]
November 18, 2022 CLERK ORDER: Appellants unopposed [ # 5219224-3 ] motion to hold this appeal in abeyance pending this court s decision in United States v. Luis Vazques, No. 22-2324, is granted. [5219295] [22-3156] (HAG) [Entered: 11/18/2022 11:52 AM]
November 4, 2022 Re-mailed correspondence - case opening letter [ # 5208972-2 ], clerk order appoint federal public defender [ # 5208990-2 ], and briefing schedule [ # 5209003-2 ] to Mr. Eric Brian Klase at 1708 Scarlett Boulevard, Lynn Haven, FL 32444. [22-3156] (CJO) [Entered: 11/04/2022 03:33 PM]
November 4, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Wyatt R. Nelson for Appellee United States of America w/service 11/04/2022 [5214818] [22-3156] (WRN) [Entered: 11/04/2022 09:55 AM]
October 25, 2022 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 22-3156: In Forma Pauperis] [5211367] [22-3156] (AEV) [Entered: 10/25/2022 02:41 PM]
October 19, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by David R. Mercer for Appellant Mr. Eric Brian Klase w/service 10/19/2022 [5209278] [22-3156] (DRM) [Entered: 10/19/2022 11:04 AM]
October 18, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Report and Recommendation 5/28/21, Order 6/1/21, Report and REcommendation 7/26/22, Order 8/25/22, docket entries, [5208986] [22-3156] (AEV) [Entered: 10/18/2022 03:01 PM]
October 18, 2022 CLERK ORDER:The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5208990] [22-3156] (AEV) [Entered: 10/18/2022 03:03 PM]
October 18, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/28/2022. Appendix due 12/07/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Eric Brian Klase due 12/07/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5209003] [22-3156] (AEV) [Entered: 10/18/2022 03:14 PM]
October 18, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5208972] [22-3156] (AEV) [Entered: 10/18/2022 02:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Eric Klase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Jean Hyde
Represented By: Shane Patrick McCullough
Represented By: Wyatt R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Eric Brian Klase
Represented By: Eric Brian Klase
Represented By: David Randolph Mercer
Represented By: Stephen C. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?