United States v. Timothy O'Laughlin
Plaintiff / Appellee: United States of America
Defendant / Appellant: Timothy O'Laughlin
Case Number: 22-3322
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Re-mailed correspondence - docketing packet, [ # 5215108-2 ], clerk order appoint federal public defender, [ # 5215119-2 ], briefing schedule, [ # 5215122-2 ] to Mr. Timothy O'Laughlin at Rochester FMC [22-3322] (CAH) [Entered: 12/05/2022 09:31 AM]
November 28, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Stephen C. Moss for Appellant Mr. Timothy O'Laughlin w/service 11/28/2022 [5221545] [22-3322] (SCM) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:06 PM]
November 21, 2022 CLERK ORDER: Appellants unopposed motion to hold this appeal in abeyance pending this courts decision in United States v. Luis Vazques, No. 22-2324, is granted. [ # 5219235-2 ] [5219990] [22-3322] (AT) [Entered: 11/21/2022 03:49 PM]
November 18, 2022 MOTION for stay, filed by Attorney Mr. David Randolph Mercer for Appellant Mr. Timothy O'Laughlin w/service 11/18/2022. [5219235] [22-3322] (DRM) [Entered: 11/18/2022 10:33 AM]
November 8, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Wyatt R. Nelson for Appellee United States of America w/service 11/08/2022 [5216023] [22-3322] (WRN) [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:05 AM]
November 7, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by David R. Mercer for Appellant Mr. Timothy O'Laughlin w/service 11/07/2022 [5215429] [22-3322] (DRM) [Entered: 11/07/2022 11:45 AM]
November 4, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, R&R 6/8/22, order 9/9/22. [5215116] [22-3322] (CAH) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:46 PM]
November 4, 2022 CLERK ORDER:The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5215119] [22-3322] (CAH) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:47 PM]
November 4, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 12/14/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Timothy O'Laughlin due 12/14/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5215122] [22-3322] (CAH) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:49 PM]
November 4, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5215108] [22-3322] (CAH) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Timothy O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Jean Hyde
Represented By: Shane Patrick McCullough
Represented By: Wyatt R. Nelson
Represented By: Kacey Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Timothy O'Laughlin
Represented By: David Randolph Mercer
Represented By: Timothy O'Laughlin
Represented By: Stephen C. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?